blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0884551 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0884551



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 92
22.07.2016 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
11.08.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
20.06.2001 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
07.02.2001 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of examination fee/designation fee/non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 1
16.11.2000 Invitation to pay examination fee/designation fees with additional fee Search / examination 2
18.04.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
25.02.2000 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
25.02.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
25.02.2000 European search report Search / examination 1
04.11.1998 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
23.07.1998 Invitation to pay claims fees Search / examination 1
09.07.1998 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
09.07.1998 Priority document Search / examination 24
19.06.1998 Abstract Search / examination 1
19.06.1998 Claims Search / examination 2
19.06.1998 Description Search / examination 16
19.06.1998 Drawings Search / examination 2
19.06.1998 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
10.06.1998 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
10.06.1998 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 21