blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0884551


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
22.06.2001 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  08.08.2001 [2001/32]
31.01.2001 Application deemed to be withdrawn
02.01.2001 Change - extension states
09.11.2000 Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973)
09.11.2000 Period of grace (R.85b EPC1973)
03.11.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  20.12.2000 [2000/51]
11.07.2000 Renewal fee
25.02.2000 Publication of search report published on  12.04.2000 [2000/15]
30.10.1998 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  16.12.1998 [1998/51]