blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0884551
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0884551Global Dossier 12.04.2000A3
EP0884551 16.12.1998A2
Priority number Date
GB9711873 10.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
GB9711873D 06.08.1997D0
Priority number Date
GB9711873 10.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US5979545 09.11.1999A
Priority number Date
GB9711873 10.06.1997