blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0884551

Designated contracting states(deleted) 
Examination procedure07.02.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
16.11.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
16.11.2000M01   Not yet paid
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:16.12.1998 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:16.12.1998 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:12.04.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:12.04.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:20.12.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
 
Event date:25.01.2001 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE 8566
Code Expl.:-DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID
 
Event date:08.08.2001 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20001013