Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0884551

EP0884551 - Facade plate, method of assembly assembled heat exchanger and kit of parts therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.06.2001
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.08.2001 [2001/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PIERCE, David, Bland
344 Sutton Road, Walsall
West Midlands WS5 3BB / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/51]For all designated states
PIERCE, David, Bland
344 Sutton Road
Walsall, West Midlands WS5 3BB / GB
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1998/51]
Representative(s)Gee, Steven William
D.W. & S.W. GEE
1 South Lynn Gardens
London Road
Shipston on Stour, Warwickshire CV36 4ER / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/51]Gee, Steven William
1 South Lynn Gardens, London Road
Shipston on Stour, Warwickshire CV36 4ER / GB
Application number, filing date98201918.410.06.1998
[1998/51]
Priority number, dateGB1997001187310.06.1997         Original published format: GB 9711873
[1998/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0884551
Date:16.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/51]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0884551
Date:12.04.2000
[2000/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:F28F19/04, F28F9/02
[1998/51]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2000/51]
Former [1998/51]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Endplatte, Verfahren und Teile zum Zusammenbau, zusammengebauter Wärmetauscher[1998/51]
English:Facade plate, method of assembly assembled heat exchanger and kit of parts therefor[1998/51]
French:Plaque de façade, méthode et éléments d'assemblage, échangeur de chaleur assemblé[1998/51]
Examination procedure13.10.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/32]
07.02.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
16.11.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
16.11.2000M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XAY]US5123482  (ABRAHAM ANTHONY W [US]) [X] 1,3 * column 1, line 50 - column 2; figure - * [A] 4,5,7,11 [Y] 2;
 [Y]US4396059  (BANNER ALAN [GB], et al) [Y] 2 * column 2, line 7 - line 10; figure . *;
 [DA]WO9403767  (PIERCE DAVID BLAND [GB]) [DA] 1,5,7,11 * abstract *;
 [A]US2272863  (YOUNG FRED M) [A] 5,7,11 * page 2, column L, paragraph 2; figure 3 *;
 [A]US5442921  (CHOW WINSTON [US], et al) [A] 5,7,11 * column 8, line 17 - line 56; figure 7 *
by applicantWO9403767