blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0973144 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0973144



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 43
16.02.2001 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
09.11.2000 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of examination fee/designation fee/non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 1
25.08.2000 Invitation to pay examination fee/designation fees with additional fee Search / examination 2
01.08.2000 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
21.03.2000 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
25.01.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
08.12.1999 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
10.09.1998 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
10.09.1998 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
10.09.1998 European search report Search / examination 1
05.08.1998 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
10.07.1998 Abstract Search / examination 1
10.07.1998 Claims Search / examination 2
10.07.1998 Description Search / examination 6
10.07.1998 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.06.1998 Drawings Search / examination 1
12.06.1998 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 8
12.06.1998 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 10