blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0973144

Designated contracting states(deleted) 
Examination procedure09.11.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/14]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
25.08.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
25.08.2000M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200003   M06   Not yet paid
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:19.01.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:19.01.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:27.09.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
 
Event date:04.04.2001 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20000720