Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973144

EP0973144 - Device with a visually perceptible image in a position incorporated into a floor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.02.2001
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.02.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.04.2001 [2001/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kuperus, Louis
Lindholm 116
2133 CX Hoofddorp / NL
For all designated states
Gherels, Willem
Spieringweg 468
2141 EB Vijfhuizen / NL
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J. , et al
Vereenigde Postbus 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir. , et al
Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97
2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL
Application number, filing date98201987.912.06.1998
[2000/03]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973144
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.09.1998
ClassificationInternational:G09F19/22
[2000/03]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2000/39]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung mit einem in Boden integrierten visuellen erkennbaren Bild[2000/03]
English:Device with a visually perceptible image in a position incorporated into a floor[2000/03]
French:Dispositif avec image visuelle perceptible incorporée dans le sol[2000/03]
Examination procedure20.07.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/14]
09.11.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/14]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
25.08.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
25.08.2000M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200003   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US5271200  (WITT ALVIN E [US]) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [DA]WO9409469  (JERMYN MICHAEL G [US])