Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0887904

EP0887904 - Safety method and device for full-voltage power supply to a user apparatus only when required, and control assembly comprising such a safety device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.05.2007
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dewert Antriebs- und Systemtechnik GmbH & Co. KG
Weststrasse 1
32278 Kirchlengern / DE
[2003/47]
Former [1999/01]For all designated states
COMPACT S.r.l.
Prolungamento via di Vittorio, 9
20065 Inzago (Milano) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Olivieri, Daniele
Via Toscana, 15
20098 San Giuliano Milanese (Milano) / IT
02 / Brambilla, Massimo
Via Padana Superiore, 39/A
20065 Inzago (Milano) / IT
03 / Delgrossi, Paolo
Via Gallarana, 55
20052 Monza (Milano) / IT
[1999/01]
Representative(s)Dantz, Jan Henning
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Dantz, Jan Henning
Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Former [2003/47]Dantz, Jan Henning
Loesenbeck Stracke Loesenbeck Patentanwälte Jöllenbecker Strasse 164
33613 Bielefeld / DE
Former [1999/01]Faraggiana, Vittorio, Dr. Ing.
Ingg. Guzzi & Ravizza S.r.l. Via Vincenzo Monti 8
20123 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date98202095.024.06.1998
[1999/01]
Priority number, dateIT1997MI0151326.06.1997         Original published format: IT MI971513
[1999/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0887904
Date:30.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/53]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0887904
Date:05.04.2000
[2000/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:H02H3/12
[1999/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/02]
Former [2001/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Former [2000/50]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IT,  LI,  LU,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Former [1999/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Schutzvorrichtung für bedarfsweisen Spannungsversorgung einer Vorrichtung, und Steuereinheit mit einer solcher Einrichtung[1999/01]
English:Safety method and device for full-voltage power supply to a user apparatus only when required, and control assembly comprising such a safety device[1999/01]
French:Méthode et dispositif de sûreté pour alimentation en tension suivant les besoins d'un appareil utilisateur, et dispositif de commande comprenant un tel dispositif[1999/01]
Examination procedure04.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/48]
06.10.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
23.02.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) MC
03.01.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/25]
02.02.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2007/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
21.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
17.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
18.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
07.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
05.12.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200609   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]DE9212599U  (DEWERT ANTRIEBS- UND SYSTEMTECHNIK GMBH & CO. KG) [X] 1,5,7,11,12,16-19 * page 4, line 8 - page 5, line 16; figure 1 *;
 [X]WO8805220  (ASCHWANDEN FRANZ [CH], et al) [X] 1,5,7,11,12,16-19 * abstract *
 [A]  ERNST R ET AL, "AUTOMATIC MAINS ISOLATING SWITCH", ELEKTOR ELECTRONICS,GB,ELEKTOR PUBLISHERS LTD. CANTERBURY, (199004), vol. 16, no. 177, ISSN 0268-4519, page 58-59, XP000113026 [A] 1,5,7,11,12,16-19 * page 1, column 2, line 4 - page 2, column 2, line 12; figure 1 *