Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0892556 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0892556



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1367
26.08.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
30.07.2003 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
15.07.2003 Closing of application Search / examination 1
02.04.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
04.09.2002 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
13.07.2000 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
10.07.2000 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
09.05.2000 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
18.01.2000 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
12.11.1999 Partial European search report Search / examination 6
09.12.1998 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
16.10.1998 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
01.10.1998 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
18.09.1998 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
08.09.1998 Priority document Search / examination 600
08.09.1998 Priority document Search / examination 426
03.07.1998 Abstract Search / examination 1
03.07.1998 Claims Search / examination 1
03.07.1998 Description Search / examination 153
03.07.1998 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
03.07.1998 Drawings Search / examination 157
03.07.1998 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
03.07.1998 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6