Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0892556


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
18.07.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  03.09.2003  [2003/36]
27.03.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn
30.08.2002 Surcharge for renewal fee
02.08.2001 Renewal fee
11.07.2000 Renewal fee
26.11.1999 Publication of search report published on  12.01.2000 [2000/02]
19.11.1999 Change - classification published on  05.01.2000 [2000/01]
19.11.1999 Change - classification published on  05.01.2000 [2000/01]
13.07.1999 Renewal fee
04.12.1998 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  20.01.1999 [1999/03]
04.12.1998 Request for examination filed published on  20.01.1999 [1999/03]
04.09.1998 Change - extension states
16.07.1998 Renewal fee