Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0892556

EP0892556 - Video decompression [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.07.2003
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.09.2003  [2003/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DISCOVISION ASSOCIATES
2355 Main Street, Suite 200
Irvine, CA 92614 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/03]For all designated states
Discovision Associates
2355 Main Street, Suite 200
Irvine, CA 92614 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Smith, Colin
Bristol, BS18 4XF / GB
02 / Finch, Helen Rosemary
Gloucestershire GL12 7ND / GB
03 / Claydon, Anthony Peter John
Bath, Avon BA2 6BZ / GB
[1999/03]
Representative(s)Vuillermoz, Bruno , et al
Cabinet Laurent & Charras
"Le Contemporain"
50, Chemin de la Bruyère
69574 Dardilly Cédex / FR
[N/P]
Former [1999/03]Vuillermoz, Bruno , et al
Cabinet Laurent & Charras B.P. 32 20, rue Louis Chirpaz
69131 Ecully Cédex / FR
Application number, filing date98202242.828.07.1995
[1999/03]
Priority number, dateGB1994001541329.07.1994         Original published format: GB 9415413
GB1995001156907.06.1995         Original published format: GB 9511569
[1999/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0892556
Date:20.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0892556
Date:12.01.2000
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/24, G06F13/00, G06F9/38
[2000/01]
Former International [1999/03]H04N7/26
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/03]
TitleGerman:Videodekompression[1999/03]
English:Video decompression[1999/03]
French:Décompression vidéo[1999/03]
Examination procedure03.07.1998Examination requested  [1999/03]
01.02.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/36]
02.04.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/36]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP95305308.9  / EP0695095
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
03.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
02.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
03.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200208   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[E]EP0674443  (DISCOVISION ASS [US]) [E] 1 * page 44, line 35 - page 46, line 53 * * table A.3.6 * * table A.11.4 * * table B.1.2 * * table B.12.4 *;
 [PX]WO9425935  (ARRAY MICROSYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [PX] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0576749  (PIONEER DIGITAL DESIGN CENTRE [GB]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0572766  (IBM [US]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0506294  (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]  - KOMORI S ET AL, "AN ELASTIC PIPELINE MECHANISM BY SELF-TIMED CIRCUITS", IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, (198802), vol. 23, no. 1, pages 111 - 117, XP000051576

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/4.266
 [A]  - KAORU UCHIDA ET AL, "A PIPELINED DATAFLOW DATAFLOW PROCESSOR ARCHITECTURE BASED ON A VARIABLE LENGTH TOKEN CONCEPT", ARCHITECTURE, UNIVERSITY PARK, AUG. 15 - 19, 1988, BRIGGS F A, (19880815), vol. 1, pages 209 - 216, XP000079309
 [A]  - TOKUMICHI MURAKAMI ET AL, "A DSP ARCHITECTURAL DESIGN FOR LOW BIT-RATE MOTION VIDEO CODEC", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, (19891001), vol. 36, no. 10, pages 1267 - 1274, XP000085313

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/31.44342
 [A]  - ELLIOTT J A ET AL, "REAL-TIME SIMULATION OF VIDEOPHONE IMAGE CODING ALGORITHMS ON RECONFIGURABLE MULTICOMPUTERS", IEE PROCEEDINGS E. COMPUTERS & DIGITAL TECHNIQUES, (19920501), vol. 139, no. 3 PART E, pages 269 - 279, XP000306411
 [A]  - MAYER A C, "THE ARCHITECTURE OF A SINGLE-CHIP PROCESSOR ARRAY FOR VIDEOCOMPRESSION", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, ROSEMONT, JUNE 8 - 10, 1993, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19930608), no. CONF. 12, page 294/295, XP000427624
 [A]  - YONG M CHONG, "A DATA-FLOW ARCHITECTURE FOR DIGITAL IMAGE PROCESSING", WESCON CONFERENCE RECORD, (19840101), pages 4/6 1 - 4/6 10, XP000565437