Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0893235

EP0893235 - Method for the production of a plastic laminate [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.10.2001
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.11.2001 [2001/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FOKKER SPECIAL PRODUCTS B.V.
P.O. Box 59
7900 AB Hoogeveen / NL
[N/P]
Former [1999/04]For all designated states
Fokker Special Products B.V.
P.O. Box 59
7900 AB Hoogeveen / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Teunissen, Johannes Martinus
P.O. Box 134
7900 AC Hoogeveen / NL
02 / Offringa, Arnt Rinse
Mendelhof 60
7908 AT Hoogeveen / NL
[1999/04]
Representative(s)de Bruijn, Leendert C. , et al
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [1999/04]de Bruijn, Leendert C. , et al
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date98202333.510.07.1998
[1999/04]
Priority number, dateNL1997100656611.07.1997         Original published format: NL 1006566
[1999/04]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0893235
Date:27.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0893235
Date:05.01.2000
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:B29C70/44, // B29K101:12
[2000/01]
Former International [1999/04]B29C70/44, // B29D9/00 , B29K101:12
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   NL [2000/37]
Former [1999/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Kunststofflaminats[1999/04]
English:Method for the production of a plastic laminate[1999/04]
French:Procédé de fabrication d'un laminé en matière plastique[1999/04]
Examination procedure06.07.1999Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
12.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/23]
02.10.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.10.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE
14.04.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/47]
17.05.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2001/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
03.08.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
03.08.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
03.08.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
03.08.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
03.08.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
03.08.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
03.08.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
03.08.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
03.08.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
03.08.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
03.08.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
03.08.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
03.08.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200104   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US4915896  (RACHAL DUANE M [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-12,15,16,20-22,24,25 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0389798  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-3,6-12,15,16,19-22,24,25 * column 8, line 33 - column 9, line 26; figure 6 * * column 4, line 30 - line 42 *;
 [X]US4622091  (LETTERMAN LESLIE E [US]) [X] 1-3,6-13,15,16,18,19,21,22,24,25 * column 2, line 29 - line 68 * * column 10, line 36 - line 68 *;
 [A]EP0516235  (DSM NV [NL]) [A] 5 * page 3, line 27 - line 33 *;
 [A]EP0318867  (BOEING CO [US]) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *