blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0979773

EP0979773 - Sail, sailcloth, method for producing them and apparatus for carrying out said method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.01.2002
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.02.2002  [2002/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lainé, Robert André
Van Duivenvoordelaan 26
2241 ST Wassenaar / NL
[2000/07]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/07]
Representative(s)van Assen, Jan Willem Bernard
Octrooibureau Assenpatent B.V.
P.O. Box 1029
2240 BA Wassenaar / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]Van Assen, Jan Willem Bernard
Octrooibureau Assenpatent B.V. P.O. Box 1029
2240 BA Wassenaar / NL
Application number, filing date98202359.014.07.1998
[2000/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0979773
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.12.1998
ClassificationIPC:B63H9/06
[2000/07]
CPC:
B63H9/0678 (EP); B63H9/067 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/07]
TitleGerman:Segel, Segeltuch, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und Gerät zur Durchführung des Verfahrens[2000/07]
English:Sail, sailcloth, method for producing them and apparatus for carrying out said method[2000/07]
French:Voile, tissu de voile, méthode pour leur production et appareil pour la mise en oeuvre de la méthode[2000/07]
Examination procedure09.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/07]
27.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.08.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/09]
14.09.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XY]FR2275359  (GREZE ANDRE [BI]) [X] 1,4 * page 1, line 37 - page 2, line 30; figures 1-4 * [Y] 2,3,6,8,9;
 [X]EP0034189  (VERSEIDAG [DE]) [X] 1,4,6,10,11 * claims 8-11 *;
 [X]DE7906321U  (VERSEIDAG-INDUSTRIETEXTILIEN) [X] 1,4 * page 8, paragraph 5 - page 9, paragraph 1 *;
 [X]EP0222610  (TEIJIN LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * page 8, line 28 - line 36 *;
 [X]EP0174792  (TEIJIN LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * page 3, line 25 - line 33 *;
 [Y]DE8913676U  (HOECHST A.G) [Y] 2,3,6,8,9 * page 2, line 5 - line 24 *;
 [A]US5355820  (CONRAD PETER G [US], et al) [A] 14-16 * column 3, line 32 - line 39; figure 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.