Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972826

EP0972826 - Process for producing a powder from a packaged tablet [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.10.2004
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.10.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.12.2004  [2004/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Ollero Novo, Maria del Mar
rue Rollebeek 48, 2
1000 Brussel / BE
02 / van Dijk, Paul Irma Albertus
Leuvensebaan 226
2580 Putte / BE
03 / Vega, Jose Luis
Bloemendallaan 47
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Engisch, Gautier , et al
NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA
IP Patent Department
Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Engisch, Gautier , et al
BVBA Procter & Gamble Europe SPRL, Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
Application number, filing date98202400.216.07.1998
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0972826
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:C11D17/06, C11D17/00, B02C19/12, B65B69/00
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/39]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Pulvers aus einer verpackten Tablette[2000/03]
English:Process for producing a powder from a packaged tablet[2000/03]
French:Procédé de production d'une poudre à partir d'une tablette emballée[2000/03]
Examination procedure10.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/32]
10.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.01.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.06.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/50]
05.07.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
05.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
04.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
04.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200407   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0468792  (GLAXO) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5489392  (SCOTT W. CAPECI ET AL.) [A] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [A]DE4204489  (ECOSAN HYGIENE) [A] 1 * claims 1,4,5 *