Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974672

EP0974672 - Improved primers for AFLP amplification [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.02.2004
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.2008Change - representativepublished on 28.05.2008  [2008/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KEYGENE N.V.
Keyenbergseweg 6, P.O. Box 216
6700 AE Wageningen / NL
[2000/04]
Inventor(s)01 / Witsenboer, Hanneke
Bassecour 97
6701 EC Wageningen / NL
02 / Kuiper, Martin Tiemen Roelof
Plattelostraat 287
3010 Kessel-Lo / BE
[2000/04]
Representative(s)van Westenbrugge, Andries , et al
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
NL-2502 LS The Hague / NL
[N/P]
Former [2008/22]van Westenbrugge, Andries , et al
Postbus 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
Former [2003/16]van Westenbrugge, Andries , et al
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
Former [2000/04]de Bruijn, Leendert C. , et al
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date98202451.521.07.1998
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974672
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974672
Date:09.04.2003
Language:EN
[2003/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:Verbesserte Primer zur AFLP Amplifizierung[2000/04]
English:Improved primers for AFLP amplification[2000/04]
French:Amorces ameliores pour l'amplification AFLP[2000/04]
Examination procedure10.03.1999Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) {1}
24.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
04.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.02.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
03.09.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
10.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.01.2003Fee for grant paid
06.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/14]
Request for further processing for:07.05.1999Request for further processing filed
10.05.1999Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
30.08.1999Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT09.04.2003
FI09.04.2003
IT09.04.2003
DK09.07.2003
GR09.07.2003
PT09.07.2003
SE09.07.2003
CY21.07.2003
IE21.07.2003
LU21.07.2003
MC31.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
[2008/12]
Former [2005/02]AT09.04.2003
FI09.04.2003
DK09.07.2003
GR09.07.2003
PT09.07.2003
SE09.07.2003
CY21.07.2003
IE21.07.2003
LU21.07.2003
MC31.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
Former [2004/40]AT09.04.2003
FI09.04.2003
DK09.07.2003
GR09.07.2003
PT09.07.2003
SE09.07.2003
CY21.07.2003
IE21.07.2003
LU21.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
Former [2004/39]AT09.04.2003
FI09.04.2003
DK09.07.2003
GR09.07.2003
PT09.07.2003
SE09.07.2003
CY21.07.2003
LU21.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
Former [2004/36]AT09.04.2003
FI09.04.2003
DK09.07.2003
GR09.07.2003
PT09.07.2003
SE09.07.2003
CY21.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
Former [2004/23]AT09.04.2003
FI09.04.2003
DK09.07.2003
GR09.07.2003
PT09.07.2003
SE09.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
Former [2004/05]AT09.04.2003
FI09.04.2003
GR09.07.2003
PT09.07.2003
SE09.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
Former [2004/04]AT09.04.2003
GR09.07.2003
PT09.07.2003
SE09.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
Former [2004/03]AT09.04.2003
GR09.07.2003
PT09.07.2003
SE09.07.2003
Former [2004/02]GR09.07.2003
PT09.07.2003
SE09.07.2003
Former [2004/01]PT09.07.2003
SE09.07.2003
Former [2003/41]SE09.07.2003
Documents cited:Search[Y]GB2295228  (UNILEVER PLC) [Y] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [DY]EP0534858  (KEYGENE NV) [DY] 15 * the whole document *;
 [DY]WO9611937  (STRATAGENE INC) [DY] 15 * see abstract *;
 [Y]  - NICHOLS R ET AL, "A UNIVERSAL NUCLEOSIDE FOR USE AT AMBIGOUS SITES IN DNA PRIMERS", NATURE, (19940609), vol. 369, no. 6480, ISSN 0028-0836, page 492/493, XP000560346 [Y] 1-16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/369492a0
 [Y]  - LOAKES D. ET AL.,, "3-Nitropyrrole and 5-nitroindole as universal bases in primers for DNA sequencing and PCR", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, vol. 23, no. 13, pages 2361 - 2366, XP002109690 [Y] 1-16 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - VOS P. ET AL.,, "AFLP: a new technique for DNA fingerprinting", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, vol. 23, no. 21, pages 4407 - 4414, XP002109691 [Y] 1-16 * see whole doc. esp. p.4411, 1.col., 1.par. ff. *
 [Y]  - HIROKO FURUYAMA ET AL, "DNA SEQUENCING DIRECTLY FROM A MIXTURE USING TERMINAL-BASE- SELECTIVE PRIMERS", DNA RESEARCH, (19941031), vol. 1, no. 5, ISSN 1340-2838, pages 231 - 237, XP000609468 [Y] 10 * see whole doc. esp. p.233 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/dnares/1.5.231
 [Y]  - JENSEN K K ET AL, "KINETICS FOR HYBRIDIZATION OF PEPTIDE NUCLEIC ACIDS (PNA) WITH DNA AND RNA STUDIED WITH THE BIACORE TECHNIQUE", BIOCHEMISTRY, (19970101), vol. 36, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 5072 - 5077, XP002062488 [Y] 10 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi9627525
 [A]  - MARTIN F.H.& CASTRO M.M., "Base pairing involving deoxyinosine:implications for probe design", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, vol. 13, no. 24, pages 8927 - 8938, XP002109692 [A] * the whole document *