Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0893868

EP0893868 - Protection circuit for output drivers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.05.2009
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.01.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 03.02.2010  [2010/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Texas Instruments Incorporated
P.O. Box 655474
13500 North Central Expressway
Dallas, TX 75265 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/28]For all designated states
Texas Instruments Incorporated
P.O. Box 655474 13500 North Central Expressway
Dallas, TX 75265 / US
Former [1999/04]For all designated states
TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INCORPORATED
P.O. Box 655474, 13500 Central Expressway
Dallas, TX 75265 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Duvvury, Charvaka
6821 Oak Park Lane
Plano, TX 75023 / US
02 / Chaine, Michael D.
4442 Lakeshore Forest Drive
Missouri City, TX 77459 / US
[1999/04]
Representative(s)Holt, Michael
Texas Instruments Limited
European Patent Department
3rd Floor
401 Grafton Gate
Milton Keynes MK9 1AQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Holt, Michael
Texas Instruments Limited European Patents Department 800 Pavilion Drive
Northampton NN4 7YL / GB
Former [1999/04]Holt, Michael
Texas Instruments Ltd., PO Box 5069
Northampton, Northamptonshire NN4 7ZE / GB
Application number, filing date98202469.722.07.1998
[1999/04]
Priority number, dateUS19970053612P24.07.1997         Original published format: US 53612 P
[1999/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0893868
Date:27.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0893868
Date:12.01.2000
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0893868
Date:09.07.2008
Language:EN
[2008/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:H02H9/04, H03K19/003
[1999/04]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/38]
Former [1999/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Schutzschaltung für Ausgangstreiberschaltungen[1999/04]
English:Protection circuit for output drivers[1999/04]
French:Circuit de protection pour circuits d'attaque de sortie[1999/04]
Examination procedure12.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
18.02.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.05.2008Fee for grant paid
23.05.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.04.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
31.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
02.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
01.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
31.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
31.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT09.07.2008
NL09.07.2008
[2010/05]
Former [2009/12]NL09.07.2008
Documents cited:Search[X]US5646808  (NAKAYAMA OSAMU [JP]) [X] 1-9 * column 11, line 33 - line 67 *;
 [X]GB2304994  (WINBOND ELECTRONICS CORP [TW]) [X] 1-9 * claim 1 *