Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0979860

EP0979860 - Fat refining [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.09.2004
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT, PT
published on 19.03.2008  [2008/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A.
Case postale 353
1800 Vevey / CH
[2000/07]
Inventor(s)01 / Bertholet, Raymond
Ch. Vers-chez-Cochard 11
1807 Blonay / CH
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Archambault, Jean
55, avenue Nestlé
1800 Vevey / CH
[2000/07]
Application number, filing date98202698.111.08.1998
[2000/07]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0979860
Date:16.02.2000
Language:FR
[2000/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0979860
Date:12.11.2003
Language:FR
[2003/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:C11B3/06
[2000/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/43]
Former [2000/07]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Raffinieren von Fetten[2000/07]
English:Fat refining[2000/07]
French:Procédé de raffinage de corps gras[2000/07]
Examination procedure16.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/41]
08.05.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.09.2003Fee for grant paid
18.09.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.08.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
14.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
14.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
13.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.11.2003
FI12.11.2003
GB12.11.2003
IE12.11.2003
IT12.11.2003
DK12.02.2004
GR12.02.2004
SE12.02.2004
PT12.04.2004
LU11.08.2004
[2008/12]
Former [2007/17]AT12.11.2003
FI12.11.2003
GB12.11.2003
IE12.11.2003
DK12.02.2004
GR12.02.2004
SE12.02.2004
LU11.08.2004
Former [2004/45]AT12.11.2003
FI12.11.2003
GB12.11.2003
IE12.11.2003
DK12.02.2004
GR12.02.2004
SE12.02.2004
Former [2004/41]AT12.11.2003
FI12.11.2003
IE12.11.2003
DK12.02.2004
GR12.02.2004
SE12.02.2004
Former [2004/40]AT12.11.2003
FI12.11.2003
IE12.11.2003
GR12.02.2004
SE12.02.2004
Former [2004/33]AT12.11.2003
FI12.11.2003
GR12.02.2004
SE12.02.2004
Former [2004/31]AT12.11.2003
FI12.11.2003
SE12.02.2004
Former [2004/26]FI12.11.2003
SE12.02.2004
Former [2004/24]SE12.02.2004
Documents cited:Search[X]GB596871  (HERBERT K ALLBRIGHT) [X] 1 * page 2, line 52 - line 75 * * page 2, line 94 - line 100 * * page 7, line 54 - line 68 * * claims 1,4 *;
 [A]JPH04370195  ;
 [DA]FR2321537  (REWO CHEMISCHE WERKE GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1 * page 4, line 2 - line 26 * * claim 1 *;
 [A]JPH05306400  ;
 [A]US3008972  (MITSUO MITANI) [A] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [A]JPS50103506  ;
 [A]US2844613  (COUSINS EDWIN R, et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 10 - line 18 * * example 1 * * claim 1 *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 05, Database accession no. 93-042669, XP002089833 & JPH04370195 A 19921222 (ASAHI DENKA KOGYO KK) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - A.C. BHATTACHARYYA ET AL., "Edible quality rice bran oil from high FFA rice bran oil by miscella refining", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN OIL CHEMISTS' SOCIETY, CHAMPAIGN US, (1986), vol. 63, no. 9, pages 1189 - 1191, XP002089832 [A] 1 * page 1189, column 2, paragraph L - page 1190, column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 1190; table 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02663949
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 51, Database accession no. 93-408922, XP002089834 & JPH05306400 A 19931119 (NISSIN SHOKUHIN KAISHA LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 75, no. 51, Database accession no. 75-83956W, XP002089835 & JPS50103506 A 19750815 (BOSO OIL FAT CO KK) [A] 1 * abstract *