blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0979863

EP0979863 - Multilayer detergent tablet with different elasticities [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.01.2004
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip09.01.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.02.2004  [2004/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Salager, Serge Eric
Lennekemarelaan 38/28
Woluwe St. Etienne / BE
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Engisch, Gautier, et al
NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA
IP Patent Department
Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]Engisch, Gautier, et al
BVBA Procter & Gamble Europe SPRL, Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
Application number, filing date98202712.013.08.1998
[2000/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0979863
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.02.1999
ClassificationIPC:C11D17/00
[2000/07]
CPC:
C11D17/0078 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/46]
Former [2000/43]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  LI 
Former [2000/07]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Mehrschichtwaschmitteltablette mit unterschiedlicher Elastizität[2000/07]
English:Multilayer detergent tablet with different elasticities[2000/07]
French:Comprimé détergent multicouche à élasticité différente[2000/07]
Examination procedure09.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/41]
08.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.08.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/09]
23.09.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
06.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
07.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
06.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
15.09.2000FR   M01   Fee paid on   21.09.2000
15.09.2000GB   M01   Fee paid on   21.09.2000
15.09.2000GR   M01   Fee paid on   21.09.2000
15.09.2000IE   M01   Fee paid on   21.09.2000
15.09.2000IT   M01   Fee paid on   21.09.2000
15.09.2000LU   M01   Fee paid on   21.09.2000
15.09.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
15.09.2000NL   M01   Fee paid on   21.09.2000
15.09.2000PT   M01   Fee paid on   21.09.2000
15.09.2000SE   M01   Fee paid on   21.09.2000
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0851025  (UNILEVER PLC.) [X] 1,10 * page 11, line 40 - page 13, line 6; claim 1 * [A] 2-9;
 [XA]EP0711827  (UNILEVER PLC.) [X] 1,7,9,10 * page 6, line 1 - page 7, line 22; claims 1,7-10 * [A] 2-6,8;
 [XA]EP0466485  (UNILEVER PLC.) [X] 1,3,7,10 * page 3, line 12 - page 5, line 51; claims 1-8,13 * [A] 2,4-6,8,9;
 [XA]EP0224128  (HENKEL KGAA.) [X] 1,10 * example -; claims 1-7 * [A] 2-8;
 [XA]WO9703177  (JOH. A. BENCKISER GMBH.) [X] 1,10 * examples 1,2; claim - * [A] 2-9;
 [X]DE4404279  (HENKEL KGAA.) [X] 1,10 * examples 1,2,5; claims 1-21 *;
 [DA]DE2207633  (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH.) [DA] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0481547  (UNILEVER NV.) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-32 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.