Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0980775

EP0980775 - Screen mountable to the door of a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.04.2003
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.04.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.05.2003  [2003/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Chen, Tsen-Shen
No. 46, Lane 228, Chung-Cheng Rd Wufeng Hsiang
Taichung Hsien / TW
[N/P]
Former [2000/08]For all designated states
Chen, Tsen-Shen
No. 46, Lane 228, Chung-Cheng Rd
Wufeng Hsiang, Taichung Hsien / TW
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/08]
Representative(s)Hooiveld, Arjen Jan Winfried , et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/08]Hooiveld, Arjen Jan Winfried , et al
Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date98202768.218.08.1998
[2000/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0980775
Date:23.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:B60J1/20, B60J11/00
[2000/08]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/44]
Former [2000/08]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Schirm, montierbar auf eine Fahrzeugtür[2000/08]
English:Screen mountable to the door of a vehicle[2000/08]
French:Ecran montable sur la porte d'un véhicule[2000/08]
Examination procedure18.08.1998Examination requested  [2000/08]
01.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.11.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/22]
16.12.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
29.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US3749147  (HESS M, et al) [X] 1-5 * column 2, line 35 - column 6, line 3; figure - *;
 [X]US3670798  (HESS MARLIN F, et al) [X] 1-5 * column 2, line 20 - column 4, line 51; figure - *;
 [X]US5713624  (TOWER GUY N [US]) [X] 1,4,5 * figure -; claim - *;
 [X]US5524694  (ARAPIS CHRISTOPHER [US]) [X] 1,5 * figure -; claim - *;
 [X]WO9710964  (SMIT BEREND [NL]) [X] 1 * abstract *;
 [X]JPH09328016  ;
 [E]FR2760214  (VIGNOLES HERVE JULES [FR]) [E] 1 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980331), vol. 098, no. 004, [X] 1 * abstract *