Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0907139

EP0907139 - Method and apparatus for reading invisibly encoded sound data on an object [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.06.2001
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US
Former [1999/14]For all designated states
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY
343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Soscia, Peter P.
Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
02 / Small, Jeffery A.
Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
03 / Reiter, Thomas C.
Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
[1999/14]
Representative(s)Lewandowsky, Klaus , et al
Kodak Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung
70323 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/14]Lewandowsky, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Kodak Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung
70323 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date98202964.704.09.1998
[1999/14]
Priority number, dateUS1997093157516.09.1997         Original published format: US 931575
US1998009962718.06.1998         Original published format: US 99627
[1999/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0907139
Date:07.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/14]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0907139
Date:23.02.2000
[2000/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:G11B7/00, G06K19/06, G06K7/10
[2000/08]
Former International [1999/14]G06K7/10
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2000/44]
Former [1999/14]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Gerät zum Lesen unsichtbar verschlüsselter Tondaten auf einem Objekt[1999/14]
English:Method and apparatus for reading invisibly encoded sound data on an object[1999/14]
French:Méthode et appareil pur lire des données de son, encodées invisiblement sur un objet[1999/14]
Examination procedure24.08.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/31]
07.02.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/31]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
13.10.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
13.10.2000M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200003   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[YA]FR2494873  (DUTHION LOUIS [FR]) [Y] 1-3,5,6 * the whole document * [A] 4;
 [YA]FR2458869  (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [Y] 1-3,5,6 * page 1, line 3 - line 24 * * page 3, line 2 - line 28 * * page 12, line 35 - page 19, line 10; figures 4,5 * [A] 4;
 [A]WO9318478  (NORAND CORP [US]) [A] 1-3,5,6 * abstract * * page 4, line 22 - page 5, line 31; figures 1,4,5 *;
 [A]US4570250  (GABRITSOS GEORGE C [US], et al) [A] 1,5 * the whole document * [A] ;
 [DA]US3970803  (KINZIE JR GEORGE R, et al) [DA] 1,5 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5128528  (HENINGER BYRNE E [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 9, line 5 - line 19 *;
 [A]GB2034995  (BRITISH BROADCASTING CORP) [A] 5 * abstract * * page 1, line 123 - page 2, line 65 *
 [Y]  SHINJI OHYAMA ET AL, "OPTICAL SHEET MEMORY SYSTEM", ELECTRONICS & COMMUNICATIONS IN JAPAN, PART II - ELECTRONICS, (19920401), vol. 75, no. 4, ISSN 8756-663X, pages 73 - 84, XP000312135 [Y] 1-3,5,6 * the whole document *