Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0910105

EP0910105 - Electrical switching system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.09.2007
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.10.2007  [2007/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CNH Italia S.p.A.
Viale delle Nazioni, 55
41100 Modena / IT
[2003/03]
Former [1999/16]For all designated states
NEW HOLLAND ITALIA S.p.A.
Viale delle Nazioni, 55, S. Matteo
I-41100 Modena / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Mongiardo, Marcello
Via Asiago N. 67
41100 Modena / IT
[1999/16]
Representative(s)Vandenbroucke, Alberic
CNH Belgium N.V. Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat, 3A
8210 Zedelgem / BE
[N/P]
Former [1999/16]Vandenbroucke, Alberic
New Holland Belgium NV. Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat, 3A
8210 Zedelgem / BE
Application number, filing date98203368.006.10.1998
[1999/16]
Priority number, dateIT1997TO0090214.10.1997         Original published format: IT TO970902
[1999/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0910105
Date:21.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0910105
Date:11.10.2000
[2000/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0910105
Date:04.10.2006
Language:EN
[2006/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP25.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01H47/00
[1999/16]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/26]
Former [1999/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Elektrisches Schaltersystem[2006/40]
English:Electrical switching system[1999/16]
French:Système de commutation électrique[1999/16]
Former [1999/16]Elektrishes Schaltungssystem
Examination procedure06.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/23]
05.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.12.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.04.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.08.2006Fee for grant paid
16.08.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.07.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
02.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
08.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
21.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[X]US5150095  (JONES WILLIAM H [US]) [X] 1-3,7-9 * the whole document *;
 [X]US4716518  (HAWKINS NICHOLAS J [GB], et al) [X] 1,5,6,8,9 * the whole document *;
 [X]US4922177  (MAUSNER EBERHARD [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,8,9 * abstract *