Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993781

EP0993781 - Improving immune function [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  06.07.2001
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.07.2001Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 22.08.2001 [2001/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A.
Case postale 353
1800 Vevey / CH
[2000/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Logman, Margot
Vlietwaard 39
1824 LS Alkmaar / NL
02 / Dirren, Henri
Ch. de la Chenalettaz 24
1806 St-Légier-La Chiésaz / CH
03 / Bruessow, Harald
Ch. de la Chaumény 13
1814 La Tour de Peilz / CH
[2000/16]
Application number, filing date98203447.213.10.1998
[2000/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0993781
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.03.1999
ClassificationInternational:A23L1/20, A61K35/78
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/52]
Former [2000/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verbesserung der Immunfunktion[2000/16]
English:Improving immune function[2000/16]
French:Renforcement de la fonction immunitaire[2000/16]
Examination procedure19.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/50]
13.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.07.2001Application withdrawn by applicant  [2001/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0404425  (CALPIS FOOD IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * page 2; claims 1-6 *;
 [X]JPH10210947  ;
 [X]JPH10203994  ;
 [X]JPH09255699  ;
 [X]CN1129077  ;
 [X]WO9707811  (CHAJUSS DANIEL [IL]) [X] 1 * pages 1-3; claims 1-5 *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 98, no. 42, Database accession no. 98-488350, XP002096044 & JPH10210947 A 19980811 (SHIOMI S) [X] 1 * abstract *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 98, no. 41, Database accession no. 98-476698, XP002096045 & JPH10203994 A 19980804 (ICHIMARU PHARCOS INC) [X] 1 * abstract *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 97, no. 51, Database accession no. 97-553400, XP002096046 & JPH09255699 A 19970930 (FUJI SEIYU KK) [X] 1 * abstract *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 97, no. 51, Database accession no. 97-550470, XP002096047 & CN1129077 A 19960821 (XIANG J) [X] 1 * abstract *