Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0921183 RSS: dossier

Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 2880
22.05.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.05.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.05.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
11.05.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.05.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.05.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
05.05.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
05.05.2017 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 10
05.05.2017 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 2
04.05.2017 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
04.05.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.05.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
28.04.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.04.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.04.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.04.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
23.02.2017 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 3
23.02.2017 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 3
01.02.2017 Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 2
01.02.2017 Communication of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
01.02.2017 Decision of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 48
29.11.2016 Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 2
29.11.2016 Communication of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
29.11.2016 Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
26.10.2016 amicus curiae Appeal 2
21.06.2016 Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 2
07.06.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 2
31.05.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
11.05.2016 Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 3
10.05.2016 amicus curiae Appeal 59
29.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
29.04.2016 All other documents for the Appeal procedure not covered by any other Code Appeal 1
29.04.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
29.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
29.04.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 16
29.04.2016 amicus curiae Appeal 36
21.04.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
07.04.2016 Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
07.04.2016 Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 2
01.04.2016 Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 2
01.04.2016 Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
29.03.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
23.03.2016 Incomming letter in referral procedure Appeal 1
21.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.03.2016 Incomming letter in referral procedure Appeal 2
21.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.03.2016 amicus curiae Appeal 4
17.03.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
17.03.2016 amicus curiae Appeal 12
15.03.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
15.03.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
15.03.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
15.03.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 49
15.03.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
15.03.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
15.03.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 20
15.03.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
15.03.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 30
15.03.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
15.03.2016 amicus curiae Appeal 171
15.03.2016 amicus curiae Appeal 2
11.03.2016 Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
11.03.2016 Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 4
11.03.2016 amicus curiae Appeal 4
10.03.2016 Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 2
10.03.2016 Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 2
10.03.2016 Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 2
10.03.2016 Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
09.03.2016 amicus curiae Appeal 43
05.03.2016 amicus curiae Appeal 4
03.03.2016 Incomming letter in referral procedure Appeal 17
03.03.2016 amicus curiae Appeal 11
01.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
01.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
01.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
01.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
01.03.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 19
01.03.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
01.03.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
01.03.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
01.03.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
01.03.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
01.03.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
01.03.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
01.03.2016 amicus curiae Appeal 5
01.03.2016 amicus curiae Appeal 2
01.03.2016 amicus curiae Appeal 5
01.03.2016 amicus curiae Appeal 8
01.03.2016 amicus curiae Appeal 3
01.03.2016 amicus curiae Appeal 9
01.03.2016 amicus curiae Appeal 9
01.03.2016 amicus curiae Appeal 1
01.03.2016 amicus curiae Appeal 17
29.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
29.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
29.02.2016 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 17
29.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
29.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
29.02.2016 amicus curiae Appeal 5
29.02.2016 amicus curiae Appeal 16
29.02.2016 amicus curiae Appeal 6
29.02.2016 amicus curiae Appeal 13
29.02.2016 amicus curiae Appeal 9
29.02.2016 amicus curiae Appeal 7
29.02.2016 amicus curiae Appeal 1
29.02.2016 amicus curiae Appeal 274
29.02.2016 amicus curiae Appeal 6
29.02.2016 amicus curiae Appeal 9
28.02.2016 amicus curiae Appeal 52
26.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
26.02.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 12
26.02.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 8
26.02.2016 Incomming letter in referral procedure Appeal 24
26.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
26.02.2016 amicus curiae Appeal 10
26.02.2016 amicus curiae Appeal 14
25.02.2016 Incomming letter in referral procedure Appeal 38
25.02.2016 amicus curiae Appeal 13
23.02.2016 amicus curiae Appeal 30
15.02.2016 amicus curiae Appeal 16
09.02.2016 amicus curiae Appeal 7
14.01.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
14.01.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
14.01.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
14.01.2016 amicus curiae Appeal 14
23.11.2015 amicus curiae Appeal 58
21.11.2015 amicus curiae Appeal 2
17.11.2015 amicus curiae Appeal 48
16.11.2015 amicus curiae Appeal 57
10.11.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
10.11.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
10.11.2015 amicus curiae Appeal 14
19.10.2015 amicus curiae Appeal 21
16.10.2015 Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 4
14.10.2015 Communication of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
14.10.2015 Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
29.09.2015 Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
24.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
24.09.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
24.09.2015 amicus curiae Appeal 13
24.09.2015 amicus curiae Appeal 1
27.08.2015 Communication of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 2
27.08.2015 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 3
24.08.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
24.08.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
20.08.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
14.08.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.08.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.08.2015 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 64
11.08.2015 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 64
11.08.2015 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
11.08.2015 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
11.08.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.12.2014 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
19.12.2014 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
19.12.2014 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 3
19.12.2014 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 3
16.12.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.12.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
15.12.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
15.12.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Appeal 3
28.11.2014 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
28.11.2014 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
28.11.2014 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 27
26.11.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 9
26.11.2014 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 7
26.11.2014 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
26.11.2014 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 7
25.11.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
12.11.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.11.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.11.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
06.11.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
06.11.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
05.11.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
05.11.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
03.11.2014 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 11
16.10.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.10.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
09.10.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
08.10.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.10.2014 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
01.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
01.10.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
01.10.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Appeal 2
29.09.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
24.09.2014 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
24.09.2014 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
19.09.2014 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
15.05.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 16
15.05.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
15.05.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
15.05.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
15.05.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
29.04.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.04.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
24.04.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
24.04.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 34
13.09.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Appeal 1
11.09.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.09.2013 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 4
10.09.2013 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
04.09.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
04.09.2013 Reply to appeal Appeal 15
06.05.2013 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
03.05.2013 Claims Appeal 2
03.05.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
03.05.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 29
03.05.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
03.05.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
03.05.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 13
29.04.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 58
11.03.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
11.03.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
18.02.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
18.02.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
18.02.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
18.02.2013 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
07.01.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.01.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.12.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.12.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
18.12.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
18.12.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
18.12.2012 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
18.12.2012 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
18.12.2012 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 8
18.12.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
18.12.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
18.12.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
18.12.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
18.12.2012 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
18.12.2012 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 1
23.11.2012 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.10.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.10.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 8
18.09.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.09.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
12.09.2012 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.04.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.04.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.03.2012 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.03.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.03.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.03.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.03.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.03.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.03.2012 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
22.03.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.03.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.03.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.03.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.03.2012 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
15.03.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 2
15.03.2012 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 1
14.03.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.03.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
13.03.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
13.03.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
13.03.2012 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
13.03.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.03.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.03.2012 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
09.02.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.02.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
06.02.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
06.02.2012 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 6
07.10.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
07.10.2011 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
02.09.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
25.08.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
25.08.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 48
25.08.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
25.08.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 36
25.08.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
25.08.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 16
25.08.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
25.08.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
25.08.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
25.08.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
25.08.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
25.08.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
25.08.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
25.08.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 38
25.08.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
25.08.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
25.08.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
25.08.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
25.08.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 35
25.08.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
05.11.2010 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
07.10.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.10.2010 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
07.10.2010 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
07.10.2010 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
07.10.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.07.2010 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
30.07.2010 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
30.07.2010 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 2
30.07.2010 Text intended for grant Search / examination 24
15.06.2010 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
10.06.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.06.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
10.06.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
10.06.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
10.06.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 2
09.06.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
14.05.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.05.2010 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 22
14.05.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.05.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 10
21.04.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 2
09.04.2010 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
09.04.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
30.03.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 1
24.03.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
24.03.2010 Claims Search / examination 1
24.03.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
24.03.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
24.03.2010 Claims Search / examination 1
24.03.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
24.03.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 3
19.03.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
19.03.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
19.03.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
19.03.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
19.03.2010 Claims Search / examination 1
19.03.2010 Claims Search / examination 1
19.03.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 4
19.02.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 2
08.02.2010 Annex to a communication Search / examination 19
08.02.2010 Annex to a communication Search / examination 1
08.02.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
08.02.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
18.01.2010 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
02.03.2006 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.02.2006 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
20.02.2006 Invitation to confirm documents filed by telegram/facsimile Search / examination 1
15.02.2006 Annex Search / examination 2
15.02.2006 Claims Search / examination 2
15.02.2006 Claims Search / examination 2
15.02.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
15.02.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
10.02.2006 Annex Search / examination 2
10.02.2006 Claims Search / examination 2
10.02.2006 Claims Search / examination 2
10.02.2006 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
10.02.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
01.12.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
29.11.2005 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.11.2005 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
03.08.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
03.08.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.07.2004 Claims Search / examination 1
09.07.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
06.07.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
26.02.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
26.02.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.06.2003 Claims Search / examination 2
25.06.2003 Claims Search / examination 3
25.06.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
20.06.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 13
10.04.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
03.04.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.12.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
10.12.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
12.08.1999 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
10.08.1999 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 2
15.06.1999 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
29.04.1999 Communication of transfer of rights/change of name of applicant Search / examination 1
28.04.1999 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
25.03.1999 Request for assignment Search / examination 18
14.12.1998 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
14.12.1998 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
14.12.1998 European search report Search / examination 1
02.12.1998 Priority document Search / examination 34
20.10.1998 Abstract Search / examination 1
20.10.1998 Claims Search / examination 3
20.10.1998 Description Search / examination 22
20.10.1998 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
20.10.1998 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
20.10.1998 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
20.10.1998 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7
19.10.1998 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
19.10.1998 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
19.10.1998 Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) Search / examination 7
19.10.1998 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 26