Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0921183


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
25.04.2019 Deletion: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked
19.04.2019 Opposition rejected published on  22.05.2019  [2019/21]
15.04.2019 New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked
08.01.2019 New entry: Despatch of communication that opposition is rejected
07.12.2018 New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
06.07.2018 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
28.07.2017 New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
19.07.2017 Deletion: Date of oral proceedings
18.07.2017 New entry: Receipt of observations in an appeal
05.05.2017 Change: Invitation to file observations in an appeal + time limit
05.05.2017 Change: Date of oral proceedings
05.05.2017 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
23.02.2017 New entry: Invitation to file observations in an appeal + time limit
21.06.2016 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
11.03.2016 Change: Date of oral proceedings
11.03.2016 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
31.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.09.2015  [2015/36]
19.12.2014 Change: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
19.12.2014 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
01.10.2014 Deletion: Date of oral proceedings
01.10.2014 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
19.09.2014 Change: Date of oral proceedings
19.09.2014 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
10.09.2013 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
06.03.2013 Change: Appeal number
18.02.2013 New entry: Appeal number
18.02.2013 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
17.12.2012 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
17.12.2012 New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked
19.03.2012 Change: Date of oral proceedings
09.03.2012 Change: Date of oral proceedings
09.03.2012 Deletion: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
07.02.2012 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.10.2011 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
02.09.2011 Opposition filed published on  05.10.2011  [2011/40]
29.10.2010 (Expected) grant published on  01.12.2010  [2010/48]
12.10.2010 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
12.10.2010 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
21.07.2010 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
18.06.2010 Change - German title published on  21.07.2010  [2010/29]
18.06.2010 Change - English title published on  21.07.2010  [2010/29]
18.06.2010 Change - French title published on  21.07.2010  [2010/29]
11.06.2010 New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
13.04.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.04.2010 Change: Date of oral proceedings
01.04.2010 Deletion: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
01.04.2010 New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
02.02.2010 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
16.06.2009 Change: Renewal fee paid
16.06.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.03.2008 Change: Renewal fee paid
28.03.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.06.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.04.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.02.2006 New entry: Reply to examination report
16.02.2006 Deletion: Reply to examination report
15.02.2006 New entry: Reply to examination report
29.11.2005 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
29.07.2005 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
17.06.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.07.2004 New entry: Reply to examination report
16.06.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.02.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
08.07.2003 New entry: Examination report or reply
18.06.2003 Renewal fee
08.04.2003 Examination report or reply
06.12.2002 Examination report or reply
06.12.2002 First examination report
25.06.2002 Renewal fee
29.05.2001 Renewal fee
30.05.2000 Renewal fee
03.06.1999 Renewal fee
30.04.1999 Change - applicant published on  16.06.1999 [1999/24]
23.04.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  09.06.1999 [1999/23]
23.04.1999 Request for examination filed published on  09.06.1999 [1999/23]
20.11.1998 Change - extension states
09.11.1998 Renewal fee