Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0921183

Designated contracting states AT 
 BE 
 DE 
 DK 
 FR 
 GBLapse: 07.06.2015
 IT 
 NL 
 SE 
Examination procedure07.10.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
19.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
25.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
22.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
17.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
07.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
04.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 09
04.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 10
06.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 11
27.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 12
08.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 13
18.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 14
05.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 15
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 16
European patent granted01.12.2010
Opposition procedure21.02.2019Date of oral proceedings 
Appeal following opposition18.02.2013APPEAL FILED
29.04.2013APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED
05.05.2017COMMUNICATION A.110(2) DISPATCHED
31.05.2017COMMUNICATION A.110(2) REPLY
28.07.2017APPEAL RESULT
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:09.06.1999 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:764198
Country of Ref Document:EP
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:09.06.1999 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE DE DK FR GB IT NL SE
 
Event date:09.06.1999 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19981019
 
Event date:16.06.1999 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
OWNER NAME:INFINEUM USA L.P.
 
Event date:22.01.2003 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20021210
 
Event date:21.07.2010 
Event description:TITLE (CORRECTION)
Free Format Text:USE OF COLD FLOW IMPROVERS IN FUEL OIL COMPOSITIONS
 
Event date:01.12.2010 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:01.12.2010 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:0764198
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:01.12.2010 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE DE DK FR GB IT NL SE
 
Event date:13.01.2011 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69536125
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20110113
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:21.02.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK T3
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS
 
Event date:16.03.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL T3
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995
 
Event date:22.03.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE TRGR
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT
 
Event date:05.10.2011 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:CLARIANT PRODUKTE (DEUTSCHLAND) GMBH
Effective DATE:20110825
 
Event date:24.11.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R026 69536125 DE
Code Expl.:-OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST PATENT
Effective DATE:20110825
 
Event date:31.07.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20140527
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:29.08.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20140620
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:29.08.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20140527
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:29.08.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20140609
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:29.08.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:20140527
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.09.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Payment DATE:20140527
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.09.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20140527
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.10.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20140610
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.10.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20140630
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:08.06.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R071 69536125 DE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF RIGHT
 
Event date:15.06.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK EUP
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT EXPIRED
Effective DATE:20150608
 
Event date:17.06.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL V4
Code Expl.:-LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT
Effective DATE:20150608
 
Event date:01.07.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB PE20
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS
Expiry DATE:20150607
 
Event date:15.07.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT MK07 490300 AT T
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY
Effective DATE:20150608
 
Event date:31.07.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20150607
 
Event date:04.08.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE EUG
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT HAS LAPSED
 
Event date:19.01.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R100 69536125 DE
Code Expl.:+EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT UNAMENDED NOW FINAL
 
Event date:22.05.2019 
Event description:OPPOSITION REJECTED
Effective DATE:20190119