Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0916263

EP0916263 - Savoury composite bakery product and savoury sponge [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1999/20]Savoury composite product
[2004/23]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.01.2006
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.04.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 23.05.2007  [2007/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A.
Case postale 353
1800 Vevey / CH
[1999/20]
Inventor(s)01 / Englund, Catarina
Karlsgatan 1A
25224 Helsingborg / SE
02 / Hug, Daniel
Aux Sécherons
1675 Vauderens / CH
03 / Svensson, Bengt
Planteringsvägen 212
25232 Helsingborg / SE
[1999/20]
Application number, filing date98203462.114.10.1998
[1999/20]
Priority number, dateGB1997002417914.11.1997         Original published format: GB 9724179
[1999/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0916263
Date:19.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0916263
Date:05.04.2000
[2000/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0916263
Date:16.03.2005
Language:EN
[2005/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:A21D13/00, A21D2/18
[2000/14]
Former International [1999/20]A21D13/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/50]
Former [1999/20]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesAL05.10.2000
LT05.10.2000
LV05.10.2000
MK05.10.2000
RO05.10.2000
SI05.10.2000
TitleGerman:Schmackhafte zusammengesetzte Backware und Backware[2005/11]
English:Savoury composite bakery product and savoury sponge[2004/23]
French:Produit composite de boulangerie savoureux et produit de boulangerie[2004/23]
Former [1999/20]Schmackhaftes zusammengesetztes Endprodukt
Former [1999/20]Savoury composite product
Former [1999/20]Produit composite savoureux
Examination procedure05.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/48]
28.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.09.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.01.2005Fee for grant paid
11.01.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.12.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
11.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGR16.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
CY14.10.2005
[2007/21]
Former [2006/14]GR16.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4390550  (KAHN MARVIN L, et al) [X] 1 * column 6, line 39 - column 7, line 2 * [Y] 2,4-8,10;
 [Y]DE19648506  (DAHLI KUCHEN F DAHLHOFF GMBH & [DE]) [Y] 2,4,6 * example 1 * * claims 1-6 *;
 [Y]EP0688503  (NESTLE SA [CH]) [Y] 2,5,6 * page 7, lines 25-29 * * claims 1-3,7,8 *;
 [Y]US4594255  (WILSON MILDRED N [US], et al) [Y] 7,8 * column 4, line 26 - column 5, line 49 * * column 6, lines 23-46 * * claims 1,10,11,14 *;
 [YA]WO9522906  (GERVAIS DANONE CO [FR]) [Y] 7,10 * page 2, lines 6-21 * * page 6, lines 5-13 * * page 8; table I.II * * claims 1,3,5,6,10,15 * [A] 1;
 [Y]EP0204940  (NAT STARCH CHEM CORP [US]) [Y] 7 * page 1, lines 11-20 * * page 3, lines 7-23 * * examples I,VII,VIII * * claims 1,3,9,10 *;
 [E]WO9902039  (KRAFT FOODS INC [US], et al) [E] 1,11 * example 1 * * claims 1,4,5 *;
 [PX]EP0839456  (GERVAIS DANONE CO [FR]) [PX] 1,10 * column 3, lines 18-40 * * example 1 * * claims 1,11,19 *;
 [PX]EP0826306  (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [PX] 1,11 * column 2, lines 4-17 * * column 8, lines 35-53 * * claims 1-3 *;
 [A]US4622226  (KE VICTOR H [US], et al) [A] 2,3 * column 1, lines 18-45 * * column 2, lines 10-43 * * example 4 * * claims 1,2,9,16,17 *