blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0995360

EP0995360 - Candied tomatoes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/17]Preserved tomatoes
[2003/39]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.03.2005
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 19.03.2008  [2008/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A.
Case postale 353
1800 Vevey / CH
[2000/17]
Inventor(s)01 / Gonzales, Carmen
Calle Covadonga 1
E-06010 Badajoz / ES
02 / Harlaux, Ginette
61 rue de Villers St-Lucien
F-60000 Beauvais / FR
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Thomas, Alain, et al
55, avenue Nestlé
1800 Vevey / CH
[2004/05]
Former [2000/17]Vuille, Roman, et al
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Application number, filing date98203522.220.10.1998
[2000/17]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0995360
Date:26.04.2000
Language:FR
[2000/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0995360
Date:28.04.2004
Language:FR
[2004/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.02.1999
ClassificationIPC:A23L1/212, A23B7/022, A23B7/08, A23B7/157
[2000/17]
CPC:
A23B7/157 (EP,US); A23B7/022 (EP,US); A23B7/08 (EP,US);
A23L19/03 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/01]
Former [2000/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesLT26.10.2000
LV26.10.2000
SI26.10.2000
TitleGerman:Zuckertomaten[2003/39]
English:Candied tomatoes[2003/39]
French:Tomates confites[2000/17]
Former [2000/17]Eingekochten Tomaten
Former [2000/17]Preserved tomatoes
Examination procedure26.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/51]
04.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.02.2004Fee for grant paid
25.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
11.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT28.04.2004
NL28.04.2004
GR28.07.2004
PT28.09.2004
LU20.10.2004
[2008/12]
Former [2007/17]AT28.04.2004
NL28.04.2004
GR28.07.2004
LU20.10.2004
Former [2006/13]AT28.04.2004
NL28.04.2004
GR28.07.2004
Former [2005/11]AT28.04.2004
GR28.07.2004
Former [2005/06]GR28.07.2004
Documents cited:Search[Y]US3788862  (HOOVER M, et al) [Y] 3 * claims 1,3,4,9 *;
 [A]WO9210940  (MCCORMICK & CO INC [US]) [A] 1,3 * page 16, line 17 - line 24; figure 2; example 6; claims 1,2 *;
 [XY]FR2682856  (GALLI PATRICK [FR]) [X] 1,2,4-6 * page 3, line 19 - page 4, line 25; claims 1,3,4 * [Y] 3;
 [A]EP0663152  (CPC INTERNATIONAL INC [US]) [A] 1,3 * example -; claims 1,5,6,12 * * page 2, line 45 - line 54 *;
 [A]FR2754149  (CHAPON PHILIPPE JEAN [FR]) [A] 1,3,4 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2757020  (MAGLIONE VIGNETTA CHANTAL [FR]) [A] 1,6* the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.