EP0995967 - Optical coordinate measuring machines and optical touch probes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Visicon Inspection Technologies, Inc. 871 Latour Court Napa, CA 94558 / US | [2006/49] |
Former [2000/17] | For all designated states Avcom Precision Instruments Company 25 Van Zant Street, Unit 1A-3 Norwalk, CT 06855 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Freifeld, Daniel 32 Clapboard Hill Road Westport, Connecticut 06880 / US | [2000/17] | Representative(s) | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Postbus 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2003/16] | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2000/17] | de Bruijn, Leendert C., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 98203550.3 | 20.10.1998 | [2000/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0995967 | Date: | 26.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0995967 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/03 | [2000/17] | CPC: |
G01B11/005 (EP,US);
G01B11/007 (EP,US);
Y10T279/23 (EP,US);
Y10T483/1809 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/01] |
Former [2000/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Optische Koordinatenmessgeräte und optische Tastköpfe | [2000/17] | English: | Optical coordinate measuring machines and optical touch probes | [2000/17] | French: | Machines optiques de mesure de coordonnées et sondes optiques à palpeur | [2000/17] | Examination procedure | 18.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/52] | 27.10.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 02.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.11.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 27.12.2006 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/23] | FR | 17.08.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE29710242U (TRAPET EUGEN DR [DE]) [X] 1-7 * figures 1,2; claims 1-14 *; | [X]US5615489 (BREYER KARL-HERMANN [DE], et al) [X] 1,3-5 * column 7, line 10 - column 8, line 10; figures 2,3,5A,5B,6 *; | [XY]US4574199 (PRYOR TIMOTHY R [CA]) [X] 1,3,5 * column 4, line 30 - column 5, line 35; figure 2 * [Y] 4; | [Y]US5313260 (MAGYAR JR PETER F [US], et al) [Y] 4 * column 8, line 64 - column 10, line 16; figures 12,13,15 *; | [A]US5404649 (HAJDUKIEWICZ PETER [GB], et al) [A] 1 * figures 7,8,10,16 *; | [E]US5825666 (FREIFELD DANIEL [US]) [E] 1-7 * the whole document * |