Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0995486

EP0995486 - Apparatus for progressively dispensing product [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  08.02.2002
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.02.2002Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 27.03.2002  [2002/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AGFA-GEVAERT
Septestraat 27
2640 Mortsel / BE
[N/P]
Former [2002/08]For all designated states
Agfa-Gevaert
Septestraat 27
2640 Mortsel / BE
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
AGFA-GEVAERT N.V.
Septestraat 27
2640 Mortsel / BE
Inventor(s)01 / Van den Bergen, Patrick c/o Agfa-Gevaert N.V.
IIE 3811, Septestraat 27
2640 Mortsel / BE
02 / Janssen, Paul c/o Agfa-Gevaert N.V.
IIE 3811, Septestraat 27
2640 Mortsel / BE
03 / Peeters, Dirk c/o Agfa-Gevaert, N.V.
IIE 3811, Septestraat 27
2640 Mortsel / BE
[2000/17]
Application number, filing date98203607.122.10.1998
[2000/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0995486
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:B01F15/04, G03D3/06
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB [2001/02]
Former [2001/01]DE,  FR,  GB 
Former [2000/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur fortschreitenden Abgabe von Produkten[2000/17]
English:Apparatus for progressively dispensing product[2000/17]
French:Appareil pour distribuer progressivement des produits[2000/17]
Examination procedure26.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/51]
03.01.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2002/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[DA]EP0854386  (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [DA] 1-7 * page 57, line 50 - page 59, line 32; figures 17A-18D; claim - *;
 [A]CH365323  (MELIKIAN INC RUDD [US]) [A] 1,3,5,6 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE4120867  (AGFA GEVAERT AG [DE]) [A] 1,5 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0537365  (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [A] 1,5 * the whole document *