Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0999631

EP0999631 - Device for the protection of an electric motor and related method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.11.2009
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.11.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.12.2009  [2009/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABB Research Ltd.
P.O. Box 8131
8050 Zürich / CH
[2009/01]
Former [2000/19]For all designated states
ABB RESEARCH LTD.
P.O. Box 8131
8050 Zürich / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Corbetta, Giuliano
Via Giuseppe Ponzio 78
20110 Milano / IT
02 / Manzoni, Ezio
Via E. Bravi 26/B
24030 Terno d'Isola (Bg) / IT
[2000/19]
Representative(s)Giavarini, Francesco , et al
Zanoli & Giavarini S.p.A.
Via Melchiorre Gioia, 64
20125 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2009/49]Giavarini, Francesco , et al
Zanoli & Giavarini S.r.l. Via Melchiorre Gioia, 64
20125 Milano / IT
Former [2006/34]Giavarini, Francesco , et al
Zanoli & Giavarini S.r.l. Via Melchiorre Gioia, 64
20125 Milano / IT
Former [2003/20]Giavarini, Francesco , et al
ZANOLI & GIAVARINI S.r.l. Viale Bianca Maria, 35
20122 Milano / IT
Former [2002/35]Giavarini, Francesco , et al
GIAVARINI E ASSOCIATI S.R.L. Via XX Settembre, 58/A
24122 Bergamo / IT
Former [2000/19]Giavarini, Francesco
ABB Ricerca S.p.A. Viale Edison, 50
20099 Sesto San Giovanni (MI) / IT
Application number, filing date98203729.306.11.1998
[2000/19]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0999631
Date:10.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0999631
Date:31.12.2008
Language:EN
[2009/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:H02H7/08
[2000/19]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2001/03]
Former [2000/19]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Schutzvorrichtung für einen elektrischen Motor und entsprechendes Verfahren[2000/19]
English:Device for the protection of an electric motor and related method[2000/19]
French:Dispositif de protection pour moteur électrique et procédé associé[2000/19]
Examination procedure25.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/51]
11.11.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
15.02.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE
24.10.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.05.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.08.2008Fee for grant paid
29.08.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.10.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
18.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
30.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
28.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
05.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
14.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
13.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
16.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
17.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
11.12.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
11.12.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
11.12.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
11.12.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
11.12.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
11.12.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
11.12.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
11.12.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
11.12.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
11.12.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]GB2294827  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,2,21 * the whole document * [Y] 19;
 [YA]US5657193  (PURKAYASTHA INDRAJIT [US]) [Y] 19 * column A; figure 3 * [A] 1;
 [A]FR2565430  (SHINKO ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 8 - line 32; figure 1 *