Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0915352

EP0915352 - Optical filter device and method of manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.10.2003
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.10.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.12.2003  [2003/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alliance Fiber Optics Products Inc.
1030 E Duane Avenue, Suite H
Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US
[1999/19]
Inventor(s)01 / Chang, Peter C.
2701 Fairbrook Drive
Mountain View, CA 94040 / US
02 / Shen, Paisheng
143 Wenatchee Common
Fremont, CA 94539 / US
03 / Mao, Zhong Ming
1040 Clyde Avenue, Apartment No. 3
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
04 / Liu, Yugiao
720 N Fair Oaks No 96
Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US
[1999/19]
Representative(s)Wharton, Peter Robert
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/19]Wharton, Peter Robert
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
Application number, filing date98203807.711.11.1998
[1999/19]
Priority number, dateUS19970065341P12.11.1997         Original published format: US 65341 P
[1999/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0915352
Date:12.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0915352
Date:19.04.2000
[2000/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:G02B5/28, H01L31/0216
[1999/19]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/52]
Former [1999/19]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Optische Filtervorrichtung und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung[1999/19]
English:Optical filter device and method of manufacturing the same[1999/19]
French:Dispositif à filtrage optique et son procédé de fabrication[1999/19]
Examination procedure18.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/50]
20.10.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
16.02.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT
28.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.07.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/50]
08.08.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
14.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
23.11.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
23.11.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
23.11.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
23.11.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
23.11.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
23.11.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
23.11.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
23.11.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
23.11.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
23.11.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
23.11.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
23.11.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
23.11.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]DE19606812  (O I B GMBH OPTISCHE INTERFEREN [DE]) [X] 1-8 * page 1, line 40 - page 2, line 64; figure 2 *;
 [XA]US5502595  (KUO LEE-CHING [TW], et al) [X] 3,4,7,8 * column 5, line 59 - column 7, line 23; figures 4-9 * [A] 1,2,5,6;
 [XA]DE3837008  (ZEISS CARL FA [DE]) [X] 3,4,7,8 * page 1, line 46 - page 4, paragraph 36; figures 1-3 * [A] 1,2,5,6;
 [A]US4377324  (DURAND WILLIAM W, et al) [A] 1-8 * column 2, line 23 - line 55; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US4659178  (KYOGOKU TETSUO [JP]) [A] 1-8 * column 2, line 50 - column 4, line 34; figures 1-6 *;
 [A]JPH06265722  ;
 [A]JPS55155306
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941216), vol. 018, no. 670, Database accession no. (P - 1845), & JP06265722 A 19940922 (SUN TEC KK) [A] 1,3,5,7 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810227), vol. 005, no. 032, Database accession no. (P - 050), & JP55155306 A 19801203 (NIPPON TELEGR & TELEPH CORP) [A] 1-8 * abstract *