blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0913505

EP0913505 - Method of removing B2O3 encapsulant from a structure [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.03.2007
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip28.11.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 31.12.2008  [2009/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RAYTHEON COMPANY
141 Spring Street
Lexington
Massachusetts 02421 / US
[N/P]
Former [2006/15]For all designated states
RAYTHEON COMPANY
141 Spring Street Lexington
Massachusetts 02421 / US
Former [1999/48]For all designated states
Raytheon Company
141 Spring Street
Lexington, Massachusetts 02421 / US
Former [1999/18]For all designated states
TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INCORPORATED
13500 North Central Expressway
Dallas Texas 75265 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Klocek, Paul
16909 Old Pond Drive
Dallas, Texas 75248 / US
 [2006/14]
Former [1999/18]01 / Klocek, Paul
2709 Strother Drive
Garland, Texas 74044 / US
Representative(s)Senior, Janet, et al
Abel & Imray
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2006/19]Senior, Janet, et al
Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PQ / GB
Former [1999/18]Darby, David Thomas, et al
Abel & Imray, 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PQ / GB
Application number, filing date98203896.021.08.1992
[1999/18]
Priority number, dateUS1991074860222.08.1991         Original published format: US 748602
[1999/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0913505
Date:06.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0913505
Date:27.03.2002
[2002/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0913505
Date:12.04.2006
Language:EN
[2006/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.02.2002
ClassificationIPC:C30B11/00, C30B29/60, G02B1/10, G02B1/02
[2002/12]
CPC:
C30B11/00 (EP,US); C30B29/40 (EP,US); C30B29/42 (EP,US);
C30B29/44 (EP,US); C30B29/48 (EP,US); C30B29/64 (EP,US);
G02B1/02 (EP,US); G02B5/207 (EP,US); G02B5/208 (EP,US);
Y10S117/90 (EP,US); Y10S148/06 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [1999/18]C30B27/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1999/18]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Entfernen einer B2O3-Einkapselungsmasse von einer Struktur[1999/18]
English:Method of removing B2O3 encapsulant from a structure[1999/18]
French:Méthode pour enlever l'encapsulant B2O3 d'une structure[1999/18]
Examination procedure09.12.1998Examination requested  [1999/18]
03.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.10.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.01.2006Fee for grant paid
17.01.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP92307647.5  / EP0529963
Opposition(s)15.01.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
09.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
09.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
09.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
09.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
11.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
03.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 09
21.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 10
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 11
18.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 12
13.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 13
15.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 14
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR12.04.2006
IT12.04.2006
DE13.07.2006
GB21.08.2006
[2009/01]
Former [2008/12]IT12.04.2006
DE13.07.2006
GB21.08.2006
Documents cited:Search[A]JPS6212695  ;
 [Y]  - WOODBURY, "Vertical gradient freeze growth of GaP", JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH, NORTH-HOLLAND PUBLISHING CO. AMSTERDAM, NL, (1976), vol. 35, no. 1, ISSN 0022-0248, pages 49 - 54, XP002182797 [Y] 1,4,5 * page 51, column R, line 12 - line 27 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-0248(76)90242-6
 [Y]  - SWIGGARD, "liquid encapsulation zone refining", JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, MANCHESTER, NEW HAMPSHIRE US, (196709), vol. 114, no. 9, pages 976 - 977, XP002188439 [Y] 1,4,5 * page 977, column R, line 22 - line 31 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870619), vol. 011, no. 192, Database accession no. (C - 429), & JP62012695 A 19870121 (NEC CORP) [A] * abstract *
 [A]  - JOHNSON, "liquid encapsulated floating zone melting of GaAs", JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH., AMSTERDAM NL, (1975), vol. 30, no. 2, pages 249 - 256, XP002188440 [A] * page 252 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-0248(75)90096-2
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.