Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0918389

EP0918389 - Low loss reverse battery protection [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.10.2009
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.10.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.11.2009  [2009/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Delphi Technologies, Inc.
PO Box 5052
Troy, MI 48007 / US
[2000/48]
Former [1999/21]For all designated states
GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION
General Motors Building 3044 West Grand Boulevard
Detroit Michigan 48202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Hazelton, Lawrence Dean
12017 Hill Road
Goodrich, Michigan 48438 / US
02 / Strayer, Lance Ronald
3983 Letart Avenue
Waterford, Michigan 48329 / US
[1999/21]
Representative(s)Denton, Michael John , et al
Delphi France SAS
Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2
22, avenue des Nations
CS 65059 Villepinte
95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [1999/21]Denton, Michael John , et al
Delphi Automotive Systems Centre Technique Paris 117 avenue des Nations B.P. 60059
95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date98203901.817.11.1998
[1999/21]
Priority number, dateUS19970066272P20.11.1997         Original published format: US 66272 P
US1998003250126.02.1998         Original published format: US 32501
[1999/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0918389
Date:26.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0918389
Date:31.05.2000
[2000/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:H02H11/00
[1999/21]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/06]
Former [1999/21]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verlustarmer Verpolschutz[1999/21]
English:Low loss reverse battery protection[1999/21]
French:Protection contre l'inversion des bornes de la batterie à faibles pertes[1999/21]
Examination procedure30.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/04]
07.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.03.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.06.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/47]
03.07.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2009/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
02.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
01.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
30.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
30.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
30.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
30.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200811   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]DE3930091  (STANDARD ELEKTRIK LORENZ AG [DE]) [X] 1-10,12,14,19-23 * abstract *;
 [A]US5517379  (WILLIAMS RICHARD K [US], et al) [A] 11,13,25 * column 4, line 16 - line 58; figure 3 *;
 [X]DE4031288  (ANT NACHRICHTENTECHNIK GMBH) [X] 1,19 * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 13; figure 3 *;
 [X]DE3535788  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,19 * abstract *
 [A]  DAVIS D, "OVERLOAD AND REVERSE-CURRENT CIRCUITRY PROTECTS BATTERY AND LOAD", EDN ELECTRICAL DESIGN NEWS,US,CAHNERS PUBLISHING CO. NEWTON, MASSACHUSETTS, (19960301), vol. 41, no. 5, ISSN 0012-7515, pages 165 - 168,170,17, XP000584147 [A] 12,14