EP1004546 - Process for the production of sodium carbonate anhydrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.11.2001 [2001/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technische Universiteit Delft Julianalaan 134 2628 BL Delft / NL | [2000/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oosterhof, Harald Oude Maasje 4 5052 VN Goirle / NL | 02 /
Witkamp, Geert-Jan Planciusdreef 21 2661 RJ Bergschenhoek / NL | 03 /
van Rosmalen, Gerda Maria Grabijnhof 1 2625 LL Delft / NL | 04 /
de Graauw, Johannes Meervalsloot 18 2724 BK Zoetermeer / NL | [2000/22] | Representative(s) | Ottevangers, Sietse Ulbe, et al Vereenigde, Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2000/22] | Application number, filing date | 98203963.8 | 24.11.1998 | [2000/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1004546 | Date: | 31.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C01D7/24, C01D7/35, C01D7/37, C01D7/40 | [2000/22] | CPC: |
C01D7/37 (EP,US);
C01D7/12 (EP,US);
C01D7/24 (EP,US);
C01D7/35 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2001/06] |
Former [2000/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren für wasserfreies Natriumkarbonat (Soda) | [2000/22] | English: | Process for the production of sodium carbonate anhydrate | [2000/22] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de soude anhydre | [2000/22] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/47] | 25.05.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2001/47] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.01.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 19.01.2001 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2000 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2670269 (RAHN HENRY W) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US3486844 (TABLER DONALD C) [A] 1 * claims 1-10 *; | [A]US3933977 (ILARDI JOSEPH M, et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US4104033 (MAHN FREDERICK, et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract;; claim 1 *; | [X]US4183901 (ILARDI JOSEPH M [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [X]GB2109783 (GLAXO GROUP LTD) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US4879042 (HANSON DONALD N [US], et al) [A] 1-7* claims 1,5,8,13-15 *; | [X]WO9741271 (BOWMAN RONALD W [US]) [X] 1-7 * page 2, line 12 - line 14; claims 1-5 * * page 3 - page 4 *; | [DX] - WEINGAERTNER D A ET AL, "EXTRACTIVE CRYSTALLIZATION OF SALTS FROM CONCENTRATED AQUEOUS SOLUTION", INDUSTRIAL & ENGINEERING CHEMISTRY RESEARCH, (19910301), vol. 30, no. 3, pages 490 - 501, XP000219275 [DX] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ie00051a009 | [A] - YANG, WENBIN ET AL, "A new technology for the manufacture of soda ash by extraction", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19831017), vol. 99, no. 16, Database accession no. 124927, XP002064450 [A] 1-7 * abstract * |