Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0923092

EP0923092 - Transformer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  10.07.2004
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.10.2009Change - applicantpublished on 18.11.2009  [2009/47]
Applicant(s)For:DE 
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Steindamm 94
20099 Hamburg / DE
For:FR  GB 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2009/47]For:DE 
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Steindamm 94
20099 Hamburg / DE
For:FR  GB 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Former [2003/20]For:DE 
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Steindamm 94
20099 Hamburg / DE
For:FR  GB 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Former [2002/40]For:DE 
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH
20099 Hamburg / DE
For:FR  GB 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Former [2000/02]For:DE 
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH
Habsburgerallee 11
52064 Aachen / DE
For:FR  GB 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Former [1999/24]For:DE 
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH
Röntgenstrasse 24
22335 Hamburg / DE
For:FR  GB 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Raets, Hubert, c/o Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH
Röntgenstrasse 24
22335 Hamburg / DE
02 / Albach, Manfred Dr., c/o Philips Patentverw. GmbH
Röntgenstrasse 24
22335 Hamburg / DE
[1999/24]
Representative(s)Peters, Carl Heinrich , et al
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Postfach 50 04 42
52088 Aachen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/24]Peters, Carl Heinrich, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH, Röntgenstrasse 24
22335 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date98204108.903.12.1998
[1999/24]
Priority number, dateDE199715484510.12.1997         Original published format: DE 19754845
[1999/24]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0923092
Date:16.06.1999
Language:DE
[1999/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0923092
Date:12.07.2000
[2000/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP29.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01F38/08
[1999/24]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/12]
Former [1999/24]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Transformator[1999/24]
English:Transformer[1999/24]
French:Transformateur[1999/24]
Examination procedure12.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/11]
21.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.03.2004Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2004/35]
04.04.2004Application refused, date of legal effect [2004/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
02.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
02.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]US4473811  (SCHAUBLE GEORGE L [US]) [X] 1-6 * column 1, line 35 - line 50 * * column 3, line 20 - column 4, line 64; figure - *;
 [X]DE231939  (ALLGEMEINE ELEKTRICITÄTS-GESELLSCHAFT) [X] 1-6 * page 2, line 50 - line 114; figure . *