Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0855326

EP0855326 - Two axled running gear for trackbound transport systems [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.06.2003
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip06.06.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.07.2003  [2003/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Demag Mobile Cranes GmbH
Dinglerstrasse 24
66482 Zweibrücken / DE
[2002/12]
Former [1998/31]For all designated states
MANNESMANN Aktiengesellschaft
Mannesmannufer 2
40213 Düsseldorf / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Pohlmann, Gerlinde, Dipl.-Ing.
Boxgraben 31
52064 Aachen / DE
02 / Franzen, Hermann, Dipl.-Ing.
Schloss-Dyck-Strasse 136
41238 Mönchengladbach / DE
03 / Kröll, Joachim
Steinstrasse 1
41363 Jüchen / DE
04 / Richter, Peter, Dipl.-Ing.
Hubertusstrasse 18
50126 Bergheim / DE
[1998/31]
Representative(s)Moser, Jörg Michael
Moser & Götze
Patentanwälte
Paul-Klinger-Strasse 9
45127 Essen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/25]Moser, Jörg Michael, Dipl.-Ing.
Rosastrasse 6 A
45130 Essen / DE
Former [2003/06]Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Meissner & Meissner, Patentanwaltsbüro, Postfach 33 01 30
14171 Berlin / DE
Former [1998/31]Presting, Hans-Joachim, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Hohenzollerndamm 89
14199 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date98250004.308.01.1998
[1998/31]
Priority number, dateDE199710370121.01.1997         Original published format: DE 19703701
[1998/31]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0855326
Date:29.07.1998
Language:DE
[1998/31]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0855326
Date:19.01.2000
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0855326
Date:31.07.2002
Language:DE
[2002/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:B61F3/12, B61F3/04, B61F5/42
[1998/31]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/39]
Former [1998/31]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Zweiachsiges Fahrwerk für schienengebundene Transportsysteme[1998/31]
English:Two axled running gear for trackbound transport systems[1998/31]
French:Train de roulement avec deux essieux pour système de transport sur rails.[1998/31]
Examination procedure13.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/15]
27.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.10.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.02.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.04.2002Fee for grant paid
15.04.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.05.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
21.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[E]EP0838386  (SCHWEIZERISCHE LOKOMOTIV) [E] 1,5,6,9,10 * column 4, line 13 - column 6, line 14; figures 1-3; claims 1,4,5 *;
 [A]US3961582  (SKILLING JOHN B ET AL) [A] 1 * column 8, line 38 - column 9, line 42; figures 1-7 *;
 [A]DE1096399  (WAGGONFABRIK UEDINGEN A.G.) [A] 1 * column 3, line 38 - column 4, line 50; figure -; claims 6,7 *;
 [A]DE19505495  (WAGGONFABRIK TALBOT GMBH & CO) [A] 1 * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 55; figure - *;
 [A]DE19520549  (KRONE BERNHARD GMBH MASCHF) [A] 1 * abstract *