Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0860216

EP0860216 - Drive for a continuous drawing device for the straight drawing of tubes or bars [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.04.2002
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.04.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.05.2002  [2002/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SMS Demag AG
Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
[2000/18]
Former [1998/35]For all designated states
MANNESMANN Aktiengesellschaft
Mannesmannufer 2
40213 Düsseldorf / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Bonsels, Ralf, Dipl.-Ing.
Diebsweg 5
41836 Hückelhoven / DE
[1998/35]
Representative(s)Meissner, Peter E. , et al
Meissner & Meissner
Patentanwaltsbüro
Hohenzollerndamm 89
14199 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/35]Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Meissner & Meissner, Patentanwaltsbüro, Hohenzollerndamm 89
14199 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date98250053.017.02.1998
[1998/35]
Priority number, dateDE199710870924.02.1997         Original published format: DE 19708709
[1998/35]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0860216
Date:26.08.1998
Language:DE
[1998/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0860216
Date:23.05.2001
Language:DE
[2001/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.06.1998
ClassificationInternational:B21C1/30
[1998/35]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   IT [1999/19]
Former [1998/35]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Antrieb für eine kontinuierliche Ziehvorrichtung zum Geradeausziehen von Rohren oder Stangen[1998/35]
English:Drive for a continuous drawing device for the straight drawing of tubes or bars[1998/35]
French:Entrainement pour un dispositif d'étirage continu pour l'étirage-droit de tubes ou barres[1998/35]
Examination procedure12.11.1998Examination requested  [1999/02]
19.09.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
17.11.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.01.2001Fee for grant paid
29.01.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.02.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
15.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]DE3031130  (HOESCH ESTEL WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 5, line 24 - page 6, line 27 * * page 9, line 8 - page 10, line 2; figure - *;
 [A]US3945547  (LEDEBUR HARRY C) [A] 1 * column 2, line 20 - line 27; figure 3 *;
 [DA]EP0433767  (DANIELI OFF MECC [IT], et al) [DA] 1;
 [PA]US5645159  (LUGINBUEHL ERICH [CH], et al);
 [A]DE4207700  (SEW EURODRIVE GMBH & CO [DE])