Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0873901

EP0873901 - Drive for a mobile working apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  23.02.2001
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip23.02.2001Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 11.04.2001 [2001/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MANNESMANN Aktiengesellschaft
Mannesmannufer 2
40213 Düsseldorf / DE
[1998/44]
Inventor(s)01 / Macit, Recep, Dipl.-Ing.
Dörpfeld 3
40625 Düsseldorf / DE
[1998/44]
Representative(s)Meissner, Peter E. , et al
Meissner & Meissner
Patentanwaltsbüro
Hohenzollerndamm 89
14199 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/44]Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Meissner & Meissner, Patentanwaltsbüro, Hohenzollerndamm 89
14199 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date98250118.103.04.1998
[1998/44]
Priority number, dateDE199711770818.04.1997         Original published format: DE 19717708
[1998/44]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0873901
Date:28.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/44]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0873901
Date:12.01.2000
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:B60K17/10, B60K25/04
[1998/44]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/38]
Former [1998/44]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Antrieb für ein Fahrbares Arbeitsgerät[1998/44]
English:Drive for a mobile working apparatus[1998/44]
French:Entraînement pour un appareil de travail mobile[1998/44]
Examination procedure13.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/15]
14.07.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
16.10.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY
15.02.2001Application withdrawn by applicant  [2001/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
08.08.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0084800  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [A] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US5117936  (FUKUDA MINORU ET AL) [A] 1 * figure - *;
 [A]EP0759371  (BRUENINGHAUS HYDROMATIK GMBH) [A] 1 * column 4, lines 4-16; figure - *