Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0892569

EP0892569 - A method of and a system for assigning a downlink channel for mobile radio communication [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.08.2004
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip27.08.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.10.2004  [2004/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/03]For all designated states
NEC CORPORATION
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Uchida, Wataru
NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
[1999/03]
Representative(s)Wenzel & Kalkoff
Patentanwälte
Meiendorfer Strasse 89
22145 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/03]Patentanwälte Wenzel & Kalkoff
Grubesallee 26
22143 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date98250236.125.06.1998
[1999/03]
Priority number, dateJP1997017056526.06.1997         Original published format: JP 17056597
[1999/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0892569
Date:20.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0892569
Date:26.01.2000
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04Q7/38
[1999/03]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2000/40]
Former [1999/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und System zur Zuteilung eines Abwärtskanals für Mobilfunkkommunikation[1999/03]
English:A method of and a system for assigning a downlink channel for mobile radio communication[1999/03]
French:Procédé et système pour l'allocation d'un canal descendant pour communication radio mobile[1999/03]
Examination procedure10.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/19]
28.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.04.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/42]
12.05.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
29.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
28.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
28.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200003   M06   Fee paid on   27.07.2000
30.06.200407   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US5471671  (WANG ZHONGHE ET AL) [X] 1-6 * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 21 * * column 9, line 19 - column 10, line 25 * * column 13, line 37 - column 14, line 53 * * column 19, line 3 - column 20, line 29 * * column 21, line 15 - column 22, line 37 * * claims 5,6,9 * * figures 6,7,10,17-20 *;
 [X]US5497505  (KOOHGOLI MAHSHAD ET AL) [X] 1,3-5 * column 2, line 28 - column 4, line 17 * * column 6, line 17 - column 8, line 12 * * figures 1,3B,4A,4B *;
 [X]EP0757500  (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD) [X] 1,3-5 * column 2, line 31 - column 3, line 39 * * column 5, line 26 - column 7, line 49 * * figures 2,4,6 *