Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0857492

EP0857492 - Laryngeal mask airways and their manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.12.2000
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.12.2000Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.01.2001 [2001/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Smiths Industries Public Limited Company
765, Finchley Road
London, NW11 8DS / GB
[1998/33]
Inventor(s)01 / Pagan, Eric
23 Stade Street
Hythe, Kent, CT21 6DA / GB
[1998/33]
Representative(s)Flint, Jonathan McNeill , et al
Smiths Group plc and Subsidiary Companies
765 Finchley Road
London NW11 8DS / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/33]Flint, Jonathan McNeill , et al
SMITHS INDUSTRIES PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY 765 Finchley Road
London NW11 8DS / GB
Application number, filing date98300072.007.01.1998
[1998/33]
Priority number, dateGB1997000233705.02.1997         Original published format: GB 9702337
[1998/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0857492
Date:12.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/33]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0857492
Date:05.04.2000
[2000/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61M16/04
[1998/33]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2000/50]
Former [1998/33]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kehlkopfmaske sowie ihr Herstellungsverfahren[1998/33]
English:Laryngeal mask airways and their manufacture[1998/33]
French:Masque laryngien et son procédé de fabrication[1998/33]
Examination procedure01.08.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/04]
29.08.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2001/04]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200003   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US5282464  (BRAIN ARCHIBALD I J [GB]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 56 - column 5, line 7; figures 1-6 *;
 [A]EP0732116  (SMITHS INDUSTRIES PLC [GB]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 13; figures 1,2 *
by applicantUS5355879
 US5305743
 US5297547
 US5282464
 GB2267034