Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0855443

EP0855443 - cDNA clone HE8CH90 that encodes a 7-transmembrane receptor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.10.2003
Database last updated on 22.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.12.2003  [2003/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION
One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia
Pennsylvania 19103 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/31]For all designated states
SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION
One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929
Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19103 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Sathe, Ganesh
SmithKline Beecham Pharma., 709 Swedeland Road
King of Prussia, Pennsylvania 19406 / US
02 / Bergsma, Derk Jon
SmithKline Beecham Pharma., 709 Swedeland Road
King of Prussia, Pennsylvania 19406 / US
[1998/31]
Representative(s)Crump, Julian Richard John , et al
Cleveland
40-43 Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1JQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/31]Crump, Julian Richard John , et al
fJ Cleveland, 40-43 Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1JQ / GB
Application number, filing date98300129.808.01.1998
[1998/31]
Priority number, dateUS1997078998228.01.1997         Original published format: US 789982
[1998/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0855443
Date:29.07.1998
Language:EN
[1998/31]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0855443
Date:01.03.2000
[2000/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/12, C12N5/10, C12N1/21, C07K14/705, C07K16/28, C12Q1/68, G01N33/50, G01N33/68, A61K31/70, A61K38/17, A61K48/00
[2000/08]
Former International [1998/31]C12N15/12, C07K14/705, C07K16/28, C12N5/10, C12Q1/68, G01N33/68, A61K38/17
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2000/45]
Former [1998/31]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:CDNS Klon HE8CH90 der für den 7-Transmembranrezeptor kodiert[1998/31]
English:cDNA clone HE8CH90 that encodes a 7-transmembrane receptor[1998/31]
French:Clone de cADN HE8CH90 qui code pour un récepteur 7-transmembranaire[1998/31]
Examination procedure01.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/44]
15.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.05.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/49]
27.06.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
23.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9630406  (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [X] 6,27 * SeqIdNo.4: 89.8% identity in 246 aa overlap with SeqIdNo.2 / SeqIdNo.3: 98.4% identity in 923 bp overlap with SeqIdNo.1 *;
 [E]WO9853062  (ALLELIX BIOPHARMA [CA], et al) [E] 1-23,25,27,28 * SeqIdNo.2: 99.4% identity in 351 aa overlap with SeqIdNo.2 / SeqIdNo.1: 99.2% identity in 1132 bp overlap with SeqIdNo.1 *;
 [E]WO9919513  (LXR BIOTECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al) [E] 1-28 * EDG4: 100.0% identity in 347 aa overlap with SeqIdNo.2 / SeqIdNo.6: 99.8% identity in 1132 bp overlap with SeqIdNo.1 *
 [X]  - KHAN A ET AL, "Stratagene Homo sapiens cDNA clone FB17F8 3' end", DATABASE EMEST 26, E.M.B.L. Databases, (19930821), XP002124592 [X] 1-3,6,27 * abstract *
 [PX]  - LAMERDIN J ET AL, "R33799_1 Homo sapiens", DATABASE TREMBL, E.M.B.L: Databases, (19970701), XP002124593 [PX] 1-7,14-18,27,28 * abstract *
 [PX]  - AN S ET AL, "Homo sapiens G protein-coupled receptor Edg-4 mRNA, complete cds", DATABASE EMHUM1, E.M.B.L. Databases, (19980107), XP002124594 [PX] 1-18,27,28 * abstract *
 [T]  - AN S ET AL, "Characterization of a novel subtype of human G protein-coupled receptor for lysophosphatidic acid", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY., (19980403), vol. 273, no. 14, pages 7906 - 7910, XP000783605 [T] 1-23,25,27,28 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.273.14.7906