Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0853907

EP0853907 - Duvet cover [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.09.2001
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.07.2004Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 25.08.2004  [2004/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Morgan, Clive
9 Garden Court, 71 Grange Road Sutton
Surrey SM2 6SP / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/30]For all designated states
Morgan, Clive
9 Garden Court, 71 Grange Road
Sutton, Surrey SM2 6SP / GB
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1998/30]
Representative(s)Pedder, James Cuthbert , et al
Regent House
1-3 Queensway
Redhill
Surrey RH1 1QT / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/30]Pedder, James Cuthbert , et al
Barlin Associates, Barlin House, 50 Throwley Way
Sutton, Surrey SM1 4BW / GB
Application number, filing date98300236.114.01.1998
[1998/30]
Priority number, dateGB1997000103518.01.1997         Original published format: GB 9701035
[1998/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0853907
Date:22.07.1998
Language:EN
[1998/30]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0853907
Date:11.08.1999
[1999/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0853907
Date:15.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/46]
Former [1999/31]Type: A3  Search report
No.:EP0853907
Date:
Status:(deleted)
[1999/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP16.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:A47G9/02
[1998/30]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/16]
Former [1998/30]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Deckbettbezug[1998/30]
English:Duvet cover[1998/30]
French:Housse pour couette[1998/30]
Examination procedure13.05.1999Examination requested  [1999/28]
08.06.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.07.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.09.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.12.1999Fee for grant paid
06.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.02.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
22.06.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, DK, FI, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT
Opposition(s)17.08.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
16.03.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
16.03.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
16.03.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
16.03.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
16.03.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
16.03.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
16.03.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
16.03.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
16.03.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
16.03.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT15.11.2000
CH15.11.2000
ES15.11.2000
FR15.11.2000
LI15.11.2000
NL15.11.2000
SE15.02.2001
DE16.02.2001
[2004/35]
Former [2003/09]AT15.11.2000
CH15.11.2000
ES15.11.2000
LI15.11.2000
NL15.11.2000
SE15.02.2001
DE16.02.2001
FR13.04.2001
Former [2002/27]AT15.11.2000
CH15.11.2000
ES15.11.2000
LI15.11.2000
SE15.02.2001
DE16.02.2001
FR13.04.2001
Former [2002/14]AT15.11.2000
CH15.11.2000
LI15.11.2000
SE15.02.2001
DE16.02.2001
FR13.04.2001
Former [2002/10]AT15.11.2000
CH15.11.2000
LI15.11.2000
SE15.02.2001
FR13.04.2001
Former [2001/51]AT15.11.2000
SE15.02.2001
Former [2001/37]AT15.11.2000
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE2804534  (LEPPER GEB LEISS EDELTRAUD DE) [X] 1-5 * page 2, paragraph L * [Y] 8;
 [Y]BE874541  (MANTA NV) [Y] 8 * figure 3 *;
 [X]DE29616095U  (HOEPPNER MARIANNE [DE]) [X] 1-4,6 * page 4, line 27 - line 35; figure - *;
 [X]FR2540718  (KOMMER MARCELLE [FR]) [X] 1-4 * figure 10; claim 2 *