Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0853141

EP0853141 - Method for surface treatment [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1998/29]Method for surface treatment, an ornament and a device
[2005/05]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.05.2006
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.05.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.06.2006  [2006/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seiko Epson Corporation
4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/29]For all designated states
SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION
4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Uchiyama, Akira
c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome
Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken / JP
[1998/29]
Representative(s)Sturt, Clifford Mark , et al
Miller Sturt Kenyon
9 John Street
London
WC1N 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/29]Sturt, Clifford Mark , et al
J. MILLER & CO. 9 John Street
London WC1N 4JH / GB
Application number, filing date98300245.214.01.1998
[1998/29]
Priority number, dateJP1997000500814.01.1997         Original published format: JP 500897
JP1997027783909.10.1997         Original published format: JP 27783997
[1998/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0853141
Date:15.07.1998
Language:EN
[1998/29]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0853141
Date:23.02.2000
[2000/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0853141
Date:06.07.2005
Language:EN
[2005/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:C23D5/06, C23D3/00
[1998/29]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI [2000/44]
Former [1998/29]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Oberflächenbehandlung[2005/05]
English:Method for surface treatment[2005/05]
French:Procédé pour le traitement de surface[2005/05]
Former [1998/29]Verfahren zur Oberflächenbehandlung, Schmuck und Gegenstand
Former [1998/29]Method for surface treatment, an ornament and a device
Former [1998/29]Procédé pour le traitement de surface, ornement et objet
Examination procedure17.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/37]
17.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.12.2004Date of oral proceedings
30.12.2004Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
12.01.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.05.2005Fee for grant paid
09.05.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.04.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
19.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
06.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
08.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
13.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[X]BE681105  (CONTINENTAL TITANIUM METALS GMBH) [X] 1,3,7 * the whole document *;
 [X]FR1455097  (CONTINENTAL TITANIUM METALS CO) [X] 1,3,7 * the whole document *;
 [X]FR92532E  (CONTIMET GMBH) [X] 1,3,7 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2959503  (LINDSON JOHN T) [X] 1,3,7 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2283188  (ROLLS ROYCE [GB]) [A] 1 * the whole document *
 [X]  A.Y. SITNOKOVA ET AL., "sYNTHESIS AND STUDY OF PROTECTIVE COATINGS FOR TITANIUM", GLASS AND CERAMICS., CONSULTANTS BUREAU. NEW YORK., US, (1978), vol. 35, no. 7/8, ISSN 0361-7610, pages 395 - 398, XP002126563 [X] 1,3,7 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00696132