Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0857550

EP0857550 - Bevel locking system for a sliding compound miter saw [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.03.2009
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip11.06.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 14.07.2010  [2010/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Black & Decker Inc.
Drummond Plaza Office Park 1423 Kirkwood Highway
Newark, DE 19711 / US
[2008/20]
Former [1998/33]For all designated states
Black & Decker Inc.
Drummond Plaza Office Park 1423 Kirkwood Highway
Newark Delaware 19711 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Stumpf, William
6813 New Cut Road
Kingsville, Maryland 21087 / US
02 / Brunson, Mark
2807 Blue Bell Court
Abindgon, Maryland 21009 / US
03 / Livingston, Scott M.
40B Bloomsbury Avenue
Catonsville, Maryland 21228 / US
04 / O'Banion, Michael L.
1230 Canon Way
Westminster, Maryland 21158 / US
05 / Moores, Robert G., Jr.
1920 Knox Avenue
Resterstown, Maryland 21136 / US
06 / Miller, John W.
16811 Ridge Road
Upperco, Maryland 21155 / US
07 / Meredith, Daryl
4533 Gross Mill Road
Hampstead, Maryland 21074 / US
08 / Kaye, Thomas
363 Catherine Street
Bel Air, Maryland 21014 / US
09 / Harman, William G., Jr.
RD 4, Box 4861
Glen Rock, PA 17327 / US
10 / Avala, Adan
P.O. Box 288
Joppa, Maryland 21085 / US
[1998/33]
Representative(s)Dlugosz, Anthony Charles , et al
Black & Decker Europe
European Group Headquarters
210 Bath Road
Slough
Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/05]Dlugosz, Anthony Charles , et al
Black & Decker Europe European Group Headquarters 210 Bath Road
Slough, Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB
Former [1998/33]Stagg, Diana Christine , et al
Emhart Patents Department Emhart International Ltd. 177 Walsall Road
Birmingham B42 1BP / GB
Application number, filing date98300639.629.01.1998
[1998/33]
Priority number, dateUS1997079889611.02.1997         Original published format: US 798896
[1998/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0857550
Date:12.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/33]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0857550
Date:27.12.2000
[2000/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0857550
Date:14.05.2008
Language:EN
[2008/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:B27B5/29, B27B5/20, B23D45/02, B23D45/14, B23D53/02
[2000/52]
Former International [1998/33]B27B5/29, B27B5/20
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/37]
Former [1998/33]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Gehrungssägeschwenklagerfestspannvorrichtung[1998/33]
English:Bevel locking system for a sliding compound miter saw[1998/33]
French:Dispositif de serrage du palier pivotable pour scie à onglets[1998/33]
Examination procedure06.02.1999Examination requested  [1999/14]
06.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.11.2007Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.11.2007
07.11.2007Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
13.11.2007Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
23.11.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.03.2008Fee for grant paid
27.03.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP08102930.8  / EP1944140
Opposition(s)17.02.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
04.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
21.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
20.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
26.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
20.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
27.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
29.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
25.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR02.02.2009
[2010/28]
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0570904  (MAKITA CORPORATION) [X] 1,2 * column 4, line 44 - column 5, line 2 * * column 7, line 16 - column 10, line 45; figures 1,2,4,6,7 * [A] 4,6,8;
 [A]US5216964  (SATO MITSUMASA ET AL) [A] 1-4,6,8,11,13,16 * column 3, line 11 - column 4, line 53; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US4587875  (DELEY THEODORE) [A] 1,4 * column 10, lines 31-55; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US4934233  (BRUNDAGE RICHARD B ET AL) [A] 1 * column 9, lines 6-31 *