Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0857854

EP0857854 - Apparatus with a nipple for use in a well [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  04.04.2003
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.04.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 21.05.2003  [2003/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC.
P.O. Box 819052
Dallas
Texas 75381-9052 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/33]For all designated states
Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.
P.O. Box 819052
Dallas, Texas 75381-9052 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Hammett, Robert C.
3437 Heather Hill Drive
Garland, Texas 75044 / US
02 / Reesing, David L.
1304 Rusdell
Irving, Texas 75060 / US
03 / Scott, Gordon K.
4900 Pear Ridge Drive 703
Dallas, Texas 75287 / US
[1998/33]
Representative(s)Wain, Christopher Paul , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London
WC1V 7LE / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/33]Wain, Christopher Paul , et al
A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
Application number, filing date98301002.611.02.1998
[1998/33]
Priority number, dateUS1997079897311.02.1997         Original published format: US 798973
[1998/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0857854
Date:12.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/33]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0857854
Date:18.09.2002
[2002/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:E21B23/02, E21B33/12, E21B23/04
[2002/38]
Former International [1998/33]E21B23/02, E21B33/12
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/33]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung mit einer Schulter zur Verwendung in einem Bohrloch[1998/33]
English:Apparatus with a nipple for use in a well[1998/33]
French:Dispositif avec épaulement pour utilisation dans un puits[1998/33]
Examination procedure29.10.2002Examination requested  [2003/01]
24.03.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
15.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]US5119875  (RICHARD RAY A [NG]) [A] 1,3,5 * figures 5A,5B,6 *;
 [A]US4749341  (BAYH III RUSSELL I [US]) [A] 1,3 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US4600055  (DURST DOUGLAS G [US], et al) [A] 9,10 * figures 1,2 *
by applicantUS5348087
 US5390735