EP0860302 - Pneumatic tyre [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.10.2004 [2004/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho, 3-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/44] | For all designated states Sumitomo Rubber Industries Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho, 3-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | ||
Former [1998/35] | For all designated states SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES LTD. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho, 3-chome, Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Komatsuki, Masato 2506-1 Sone-cho Takasago-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Miyazaki, Shinichi 2-3-26-201 Sumaura-douri, Suma-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [1998/35] | Representative(s) | Thul, Stephan, et al Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/10] | Thul, Stephan, et al Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/35] | Stewart, Charles Geoffrey Dunlop Tyres Ltd Fort Dunlop, Erdington, Birmingham B24 9QT / GB | Application number, filing date | 98301349.1 | 24.02.1998 | [1998/35] | Priority number, date | JP19970041022 | 25.02.1997 Original published format: JP 4102297 | [1998/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0860302 | Date: | 26.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0860302 | Date: | 03.01.2001 | [2001/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0860302 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B60C9/04, B60C9/00, B60C9/08 | [1998/35] | CPC: |
B60C9/0042 (EP,US);
B60C9/02 (EP,US);
B60C9/08 (EP,US);
Y10S57/902 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, GB [2001/38] |
Former [1998/35] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Luftreifen | [1998/35] | English: | Pneumatic tyre | [1998/35] | French: | Bandage pneumatique | [1998/35] | Examination procedure | 07.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/32] | 06.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4374977 (FUJIWARA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 2, line 24 - line 44 * * column 12, line 31 - line 61 * * column 19, line 50 - line 62 * * column 26, line 64 - column 31, line 15 *; | [A]EP0624667 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [A] 2-5 * page 4, line 7 - line 45 * * page 6, line 37 - line 43 * * figures 1,2 * |