blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0863185

EP0863185 - Flame retardant additive based on polysiloxane for aromatic polymers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.03.2004
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip29.02.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 02.04.2008  [2008/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/37]For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Davis, Gary Charles
5 Felicia Court
Albany, New York 12205 / US
02 / Lewis, Larry Neil
7 Harvest Drive
Scotia, New York 12302 / US
[1998/37]
Representative(s)Szary, Anne Catherine
GPO Europe
GE International Inc. The Ark
201 Talgarth Road
Hammersmith
London W6 8BJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/37]Szary, Anne Catherine, Dr.
London Patent Operation, GE International, Inc., Essex House, 12-13 Essex Street
London WC2R 3AA / GB
Application number, filing date98301404.426.02.1998
[1998/37]
Priority number, dateUS1997081010003.03.1997         Original published format: US 810100
[1998/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0863185
Date:09.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0863185
Date:02.02.2000
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0863185
Date:14.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.12.1999
ClassificationIPC:C08L69/00, C08L101/00, C08L83/04, // (C08L69/00, 83:04),(C08L101/00, 83:04)
[1998/37]
CPC:
C08L69/00 (EP,US)
C-Set:
C08L69/00, C08L83/00 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/41]
Former [1998/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Flammschutzmittel auf Basis von Polysiloxan für aromatische Polymere[1998/37]
English:Flame retardant additive based on polysiloxane for aromatic polymers[1998/37]
French:Additif ignifuge à base de polysiloxane pour des polymères aromatiques[1998/37]
Examination procedure02.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
21.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.12.2002Fee for grant paid
17.12.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
28.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE14.05.2003
FR14.05.2003
IT14.05.2003
NL14.05.2003
ES25.08.2003
[2008/14]
Former [2006/32]BE14.05.2003
FR14.05.2003
NL14.05.2003
ES25.08.2003
Former [2004/28]BE14.05.2003
NL14.05.2003
ES25.08.2003
Former [2004/03]NL14.05.2003
ES25.08.2003
Former [2004/02]NL14.05.2003
Documents cited:Search[DA]US4954549  (LEWIS LARRY N [US], et al) [DA] 1,3,4,8 * column 3, line 33 - line 38 * * example - ** claim . *;
 [A]EP0497004  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 3, line 36 - line 37 * * example . * * claim - *;
 [X]EP0525782  (DOW CORNING TORAY SILICONE [JP]) [X] 1,2,5 * page 6, line 9 - line 10 * * example - *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.