Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0863544

EP0863544 - Substrate for use in wafer attracting apparatus and manufacturing method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.11.2008
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.11.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.12.2008  [2008/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NGK Insulators, Ltd.
2-56, Suda-Cho, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya City, Aichi Pref. / JP
[N/P]
Former [2007/52]For all designated states
NGK INSULATORS, LTD.
2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya City, Aichi Pref. / JP
Former [1998/37]For all designated states
NGK INSULATORS, LTD.
2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya City Aichi Pref. / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ohno, Masashi
Takeda Minami Shataku 106, 15 Takeda-Machi 2-Chome
Mizuho-Ku, Nagoya City, Aichi Pref. / JP
02 / Yamada, Naohito
Shato Kachigawa 2-306, 15, Yamato-Dori 1-Chome
Kasugai City, Aichi Pref. / JP
03 / Inoue, Takahiro
17-7, Yabutanaka 2-Chome
Gifu City, Gifu Pref. / JP
04 / Kato, Kouji
4-1, Hataya 1-Chome, Atsuta-Ku
Nagoya City, Aichi Pref. / JP
[1998/37]
Representative(s)Paget, Hugh Charles Edward , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/37]Paget, Hugh Charles Edward , et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date98301665.006.03.1998
[1998/37]
Priority number, dateJP1997006747806.03.1997         Original published format: JP 6747897
[1998/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0863544
Date:09.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0863544
Date:05.01.2000
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0863544
Date:26.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/68
[1998/37]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/37]
Former [1998/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Substrat zur Verwendung mit Scheibenattraktionsgerät und dessen Herstellungsverfahren[1998/37]
English:Substrate for use in wafer attracting apparatus and manufacturing method thereof[1998/37]
French:Substrat destiné à être utilisé dans un appareil pour attirer des plaquettes semiconductrices et procédé de fabrication[1998/37]
Examination procedure26.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/13]
11.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.07.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.11.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.07.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.11.2007Fee for grant paid
12.11.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.09.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
24.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
23.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
22.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
22.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
22.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[PA]JPH09213774  ;
 [A]JPH07297265  ;
 [PA]EP0806798  (APPLIED MATERIALS INC) [PA] 1-20 * column 1, line 32 - line 56 *;
 [A]US5514243  (MATSUDA IZURU ET AL) [A] 1-20 * column 3, line 5 - line 32; figures 2,3 *;
 [PA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971225), vol. 1997, no. 12, & JP09213774 A 19970815 (KYOCERA CORP) [PA] 1-9,18-20 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960329), vol. 1996, no. 03, & JP07297265 A 19951110 (SHIN ETSU CHEM CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * abstract *
 [A]  - MAMORU NAKASUJI ET AL, "LOW VOLTAGE AND HIGH SPEED OPERATING ELECTROSTATIC WAFER CHUCK USING SPUTTERED TANTALUM OXIDE MEMBRANE", JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY: PART A,US,AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, vol. 12, no. 5, ISSN 0734-2101, page 2834-2839, XP000476651 [A] 1-20 * page 2836, column R, paragraph 1 - paragraph 3; figures 5-7 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1116/1.578953