Designated contracting states | CH | | DE | | FR | | GB | | LI | | Examination procedure | 14.08.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.06.1999 | AT   M01  
Not yet paid | 09.06.1999 | BE   M01  
Not yet paid | 09.06.1999 | DK   M01  
Not yet paid | 09.06.1999 | ES   M01  
Not yet paid | 09.06.1999 | FI   M01  
Not yet paid | 09.06.1999 | GR   M01  
Not yet paid | 09.06.1999 | IE   M01  
Not yet paid | 09.06.1999 | IT   M01  
Not yet paid | 09.06.1999 | LU   M01  
Not yet paid | 09.06.1999 | MC   M01  
Not yet paid | 09.06.1999 | NL   M01  
Not yet paid | 09.06.1999 | PT   M01  
Not yet paid | 09.06.1999 | SE   M01  
Not yet paid | European patent granted | 29.01.2003 | Opposition procedure | 30.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.01.2004 | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 29.01.2003 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Designated State(s): | CH DE FR GB LI | | Event date: | 31.01.2003 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH EP | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI | | Event date: | 14.02.2003 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH NV | Code Expl.: | NEW AGENT | REPRESENTATIVE: | PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG | | Event date: | 06.03.2003 | | Event description: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 69810975 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 20030306 | Kind Code of Ref Document: | P | | Event date: | 29.01.2003 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | | Event date: | 23.09.1998 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | CH DE FR GB LI | | Event date: | 23.09.1998 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Free Format Text: | AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI | | Event date: | 06.05.1999 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 19990304 | | Event date: | 02.06.1999 | | Event description: | DESIGNATION FEES PAID | Free Format Text: | CH DE FR GB LI | | Event date: | 02.06.1999 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTED) | Designated State(s): | CH DE FR GB LI | | Event date: | 03.01.2001 | | Event description: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20001117 | | Event date: | 18.07.2003 | | Event description: | FR: TRANSLATION FILED | | Event date: | 21.01.2004 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20031030 | | Event date: | 15.11.2006 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PL | Code Expl.: | -PATENT CEASED | | Event date: | 29.11.2006 | | Event description: | GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20060318 | | Event date: | 15.12.2006 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH AEN | Code Expl.: | SCOPE OR VALIDITY OF THE PATENT MODIFIED | Free Format Text: | LE BREVET A ETE REACTIVE SELON LA DEMANDE DE POURSUITE DE LA PROCEDURE DU 20.11.2006. | | Event date: | 13.12.2006 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB 728V | Code Expl.: | APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION FILED (SECT. 28/1977) | | Event date: | 26.01.2007 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR ST | Code Expl.: | -NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE | Effective DATE: | 20061130 | | Event date: | 16.03.2007 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR FC | Code Expl.: | DECISION OF INPI DIRECTOR GENERAL TO APPROVE REQUEST FOR RESTORATION | | Event date: | 25.07.2007 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB 728Y | Code Expl.: | APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION ALLOWED (SECT. 28/1977) | | Event date: | 24.11.2007 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20070511 | Year of Fee Payment: | 10 | | Event date: | 18.03.2006 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20060318 | | Event date: | 31.03.2006 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20060331 | | Event date: | 31.01.2008 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20060331 | | Event date: | 22.03.2007 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Payment DATE: | 20070322 | Year of Fee Payment: | 10 | | Event date: | 25.04.2007 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20070425 | Year of Fee Payment: | 10 | | Event date: | 30.04.2008 | | Event description: | PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Effective DATE: | 20070207 | | Event date: | 30.04.2008 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20070213 | Year of Fee Payment: | 10 | | Event date: | 26.11.2008 | | Event description: | GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20080318 | | Event date: | 19.12.2008 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR ST | Code Expl.: | -NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE | Effective DATE: | 20081125 | | Event date: | 30.01.2009 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20080331 | | Event date: | 30.01.2009 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20081001 | | Event date: | 30.01.2009 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20080331 | | Event date: | 30.04.2009 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20080331 | | Event date: | 30.06.2009 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20080318 | | Event date: | 31.10.2008 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PL | Code Expl.: | -PATENT CEASED | | Event date: | 13.12.2002 | | Event description: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Event date: | 30.04.2002 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA | | Event date: | 28.01.2002 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA | | Event date: | 22.01.2002 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS AGRA | | Event date: | 22.01.2002 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA | | Event date: | 29.08.2001 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS AGRA | | Event date: | 07.08.1998 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 05.12.2003 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Event date: | 05.12.2003 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | |